EP3005799 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DATA OFFLOAD IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Shiwei 78 Roswell Drive Nepean, ON K2J 0H5 / CA | 02 /
BLANKENSHIP, Yufei, Wu 21910 Pine Lake Circle Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | 03 /
CAI, Zhijun 43045 Clarks Mill Terrace Ashburn, Virginia, 20148 / US | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
GAO, Shiwei 78 Roswell Drive Nepean, ON K2J 0H5 / CA | ||
02 /
BLANKENSHIP, Yufei, Wu 21910 Pine Lake Circle Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | |||
03 /
CAI, Zhijun 5000 Riverside Drive Brazos East Suite 100 Ext. 63775 Irving, TX 75039 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2016/15] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2, D02 T668 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14804195.7 | 30.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US40255 | Priority number, date | US201313907367 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: US201313907367 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194207 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005799 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3005799 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/18, H04B7/02, H04W92/20, H04W72/04, H04W16/32, H04W76/15 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H04W16/32 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04B7/02 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04W72/27 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W72/0473 (US);
H04W88/06 (US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | H04W52/18, H04B7/02 | ||
Former IPC [2016/15] | H04W52/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM DATEN-OFFLOAD IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN | [2016/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DATA OFFLOAD IN WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2016/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉLESTAGE DE DONNÉES DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 23.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23182612.4 / EP4255045 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/11] | HR | 05.07.2023 | |
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013070127 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8,10,11,13-15 * page 2, lines 1-2 * * pages 13-15; figures 1a,3a,3b *[I] 2,3,5,7,9,12 | International search | [A]US2008285499 (ZHANG HANG [CA], et al); | [Y]US2009163211 (KITAZOE MASATO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012106432 (LEE HEE BONG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2012213092 (SUN HAITONG [US], et al); | [A]US2013039232 (KIM SOENGHUN [KR], et al); | [X]WO2013027024 (SCA IPLA HOLDINGS INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013029000 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2013107704 (DINAN ESMAEL HEJAZI [US]); | [A]US2013128790 (FUTAKI HISASHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2013070127 |