EP2924991 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE DISPLAY SYSTEM, METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | [2019/22] |
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | ||
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Zejin Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HE, Feng Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WU, Bin Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/40] | 01 /
GUO, Zejin Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
HE, Feng Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
WU, Bin Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14812391.2 | 21.02.2014 | [2015/40] | WO2014CN72380 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015123862 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924991 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2924991 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2924991 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, G02B26/08, G02B27/22 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
H04N13/363 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/322 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/0875 (US);
G02B26/0883 (EP,KR,US);
G02B30/24 (KR,US);
G02B30/25 (KR,US);
G02B30/35 (EP,KR,US);
G02B30/36 (EP,KR,US);
G02B30/52 (KR,US);
G02B30/54 (KR,US);
H04N13/302 (US);
H04N13/393 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/41] | H04N13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2015/40] | H04N13/00, G02B26/08, G02B27/22, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE DREIDIMENSIONALER BILDER | [2015/40] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE DISPLAY SYSTEM, METHOD AND DEVICE | [2015/40] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2014 | Translation filed | 23.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 11.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2014 | AL | 12.09.2018 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | IE | 21.02.2019 | LU | 21.02.2019 | MT | 21.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.02.2014 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
MT | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
MT | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
MT | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.02.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001013960 (POPOVICH MILAN M [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 14a, 14b * * figures 18-20 * * paragraph [0097] ** paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0125] *; | [Y]US2003067421 (SULLIVAN ALAN [US]) [Y] 3,12,17 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0044] *; | [XY]US2005057812 (RABER PETER E [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11,16 * figures 1, 3 * * claim 6 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] * [Y] 3-9,12-15,17-20; | [A]WO2005069058 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 5 * * page 6, line 24 - line 32 * * page 7, line 1 - line 25 *; | [Y]WO2005120084 (UNIV SUSSEX [GB], et al) [Y] 5-9,14,15,19,20 * figure 1 * * Abstract * * page 27, line 12 - line 17 * * page 27, line 21 - line 25 *; | [A]WO2006017771 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 10, 16-18 * * page 21, line 29 - line 35 * * page 22, line 1 - line 10 *; | [Y] - PASTOOR S ET AL, "3-D displays: A review of current technologies", DISPLAYS DEVICES, DEMPA PUBLICATIONS, TOKYO, JP, (19970401), vol. 17, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0141-9382(96)01040-2, ISSN 0141-9382, pages 100 - 110, XP004068287 [Y] 4,13,18 * page 104; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-9382(96)01040-2 | International search | [A]US2003067421 (SULLIVAN ALAN [US]) [A] 1-20* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101783966 (CHINESE ACAD INST AUTOMATION) [A] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0039-0055, and figure 2 *; | [A]CN102447935 (UNIV SHENYANG AEROSPACE) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |