EP3011009 - BACTERIAL MUTANTS WITH IMPROVED TRANSFORMATION EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERRY, Barbara 26679 Via Robles Winters California 95694 / US | 02 /
BERKA, Randy 3609 Modoc Place Davis California 95618 / US | [2016/17] | Application number, filing date | 14813009.9 | 18.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014US42977 | Priority number, date | US201361836448P | 18.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361836448 P | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014205096 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011009 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12P1/04, // C12N9/00, C12P21/00, C12N15/52, C12N15/75 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/75 (US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12P1/04 (US);
C12P21/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12P1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLE MUTANTEN MIT VERBESSERTER TRANSFORMATIONSEFFIZIENZ | [2016/17] | English: | BACTERIAL MUTANTS WITH IMPROVED TRANSFORMATION EFFICIENCY | [2016/17] | French: | MUTANTS BACTÉRIENS PRÉSENTANT UNE EFFICACITÉ DE TRANSFORMATION AMÉLIORÉE | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 12.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2014052630 (NOVOZYMES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - J. HAHN ET AL, "Inactivation of mecA prevents recovery from the competent state and interferes with cell division and the partitioning of nucleoids in Bacillus subtilis", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (19951115), vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2958.1995.mmi_18040755.x, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 755 - 767, XP055088876 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.1995.mmi_18040755.x | [A] - L. W. HAMOEN, "Controlling competence in Bacillus subtilis: shared use of regulators", MICROBIOLOGY, (20030101), vol. 149, no. 1, doi:10.1099/mic.0.26003-0, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 9 - 17, XP055088717 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.26003-0 | International search | [Y]US7494798 (BERKA RANDY [US], et al); | [A]US2013071439 (LOSICK RICHARD [US], et al); | [X] - NAGORSKA, K. ET AL., "Importance of eps genes from Bacillus subtilis in biofilm formation and swarming", JOURNAL OF APPLIED GENETICS, (20100101), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 369 - 381, XP055302718 | [A] - MARVASI, MASSIMILIANO ET AL., "Exopolymeric substances (EPS) from Bacillus subtilis: polymers and genes encoding their synthesis", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (20100101), vol. 313, no. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1574-6968.2010.02085.X, pages 1 - 9, XP055302725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.2010.02085.x | [A] - GUTTENPLAN, SARAH B. ET AL., "The EpsE flagellar clutch is bifunctional and synergizes with EPS biosynthesis to promote Bacillus subtilis biofilm formation", PLOS GENETICS, (20101201), vol. 6, no. 12, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PGEN.1001243, pages 1 - 12, XP055302727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1001243 |