EP3013844 - PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF ABIRATERONE ACETATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries LTD 17/B Mahal Industrial Estate Mahakali Caves Road Andheri (East) Mumbai 400 093 / IN | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THENNATI, Rajamannar Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Nima Compound Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda 390020 / IN | 02 /
REHANI, Rajeev Budhdev Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Nima Compound Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda 390020 / IN | 03 /
PATEL, Nischalkumar Vinodbhai Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Nima Compound Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda 390020 / IN | 04 /
KANSARA, Riteshkumar Rajnikant Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited Nima Compound Near Pratham Enclave Tandalja Road Baroda 390020 / IN | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | O'Neill, Michelle Harrison IP 1st Floor, Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane York, YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14816900.6 | 24.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014IN00420 | Priority number, date | IN2013MUM2133 | 24.06.2013 Original published format: IN 2133MU2013 | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/18] | INMM21332013 | 24.06.2013 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014207762 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3013844 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07J31/00, C07J43/00, C07J1/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C07J43/003 (EP,US);
C07J1/0003 (US);
C07J1/0011 (EP,US);
C07J31/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | C07J13/00, C07J43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ABIRATERONACETAT | [2016/18] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF ABIRATERONE ACETATE | [2016/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ACÉTATE D'ABIRATÉRONE | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 09.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPY]WO2014071984 (SYNTHON BV [NL]) [XP] 10 * claims 1, 4-6 * * page 9, paragraph 4 * [Y] 1-9; | [E]WO2015015246 (IND CHIMICA SRL [IT]) [E] 1,10 * page 6, paragraph 6; example 1 *; | [E]WO2015014686 (IND CHIMICA SRL [IT]) [E] 1,10* examples 3,4 *; | [XY] - POTTER G A ET AL, "Novel steroidal inhibitors of human cytochrome P450-17alpha (17-alpha-hydroxylase-C-17,20-lyase): Potential agents for the treatment of prostatic cancer", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19950101), vol. 38, no. 13, doi:10.1021/JM00013A022, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2463 - 2471, XP002302489 [X] 10 * page 2467, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00013a022 | International search | [X]WO9320097 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al); | [A]WO2006021777 (BTG INT LTD [GB], et al); | [XP]WO2014071983 (SYNTHON BV [NL]) |