EP3047287 - FAULT LOCATION CALCULATING TRAVELING WAVE ARRIVAL TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schweitzer Engineering Laboratories, Inc. 2350 Northeast Hopkins Court Pullmann, WA 99163 / US | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWEITZER, Edmund O. III 330 NW Brandon Drive Pullman, Washington 99163 / US | 02 /
MYNAM, Mangapathirao Venkata 1400 Lehman Court Pullman, Washington 99163 / US | 03 /
GUZMAN-CASILLAS, Armando 305 SW Prairie Court Pullman, Washington 99163 / US | 04 /
LEE, Tony J. 1235 A SW Lost Trail Drive Pullman, Washington 99163 / US | 05 /
SKENDZIC, Veselin 2024 Serendipity Way Schwenksville, Pennsylvania 19473 / US | 06 /
KASZTENNY, Bogdan Z. 26 Sir Galahad Place Markham, Ontario L3P 2H6 / CA | 07 /
WHITEHEAD, David E. 1130 SW Crestview Pullman, Washington 99163 / US | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy Robert, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Smith, Jeremy Robert, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14843786.6 | 16.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014US55894 | Priority number, date | US201361878524P | 16.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361878524 P | US201414486921 | 15.09.2014 Original published format: US201414486921 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015039113 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047287 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08, G01R31/11, G01R31/315, G01R19/25, H02H7/26 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G01R31/085 (EP,US);
G01R31/088 (EP,US);
G01R31/11 (EP,US);
H02H7/265 (EP,US);
G01R19/2513 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | G01R31/08, G01R31/11, G01R31/315 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | BERECHNUNG EINER WANDERWELLEN-ANKUNFTSZEIT MIT FEHLERORTUNG | [2016/30] | English: | FAULT LOCATION CALCULATING TRAVELING WAVE ARRIVAL TIME | [2016/30] | French: | TEMPS D'ARRIVÉE D'ONDE PROGRESSIVE PERMETTANT DE CALCULER L'EMPLACEMENT D'UNE PANNE | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 21.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4766549 (SCHWEITZER III EDMUND O [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 30 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 56 * [I] 2-11,13-15; | [XI]US2013096854 (SCHWEITZER EDMUND O III [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0017] - [0024] - [0026] - [0030] , [0036] - [0049] - [0052] - [0056] - [0068] - [0069] - [0087] * [I] 1-11,13-15; | [A]WO2006092632 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 27-35 * * page 6, lines 26-29 * | [A] - Tom O Haver ET AL, "A Pragmatic Introduction to Signal Processing with applications in Chemical Analysis An illustrated essay with software available for free download", (20130812), URL: https://web-beta.archive.org/web/20130821030141/http://terpconnect.umd.edu/~toh/spectrum/IntroToSignalProcessing.pdf, (20170406), XP055362699 [A] 1-15 * pages 6-8,11 * * pages 23,25,37 * * page 74 * | International search | [X]US2013096854 (SCHWEITZER EDMUND O III [US], et al); | [Y]US2011173496 (HOSEK MARTIN [US], et al) |