EP3056563 - METHOD OF PRODUCING RETINAL PIGMENT EPITHELIAL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEALIOS K.K. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6115 / JP | For all designated states RIKEN 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | For all designated states Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2020/24] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states HEALIOS K.K. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6115 / JP | ||
For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | |||
For all designated states Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | |||
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Healios K.K. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6115 / JP | ||
For all designated states Riken 2-1, Hirosawa Wakou-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | |||
For all designated states Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWADA, Masanori c/o Healios K.K. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6115 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Masayo c/o RIKEN 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | 03 /
SEKIGUCHI, Kiyotoshi c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/33] | Tuxworth, Pamela M. J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14851809.5 | 09.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014JP77111 | Priority number, date | JP20130212345 | 09.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013212345 | [2016/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015053375 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3056563 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3056563 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, A61K35/12, A61K35/44, A61P27/02, C12N5/074, C12N5/0775, C12N15/09 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
C12N5/0621 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
C12N2501/727 (US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER RETINAPIGMENTEPITHELZELLE | [2016/33] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING RETINAL PIGMENT EPITHELIAL CELL | [2016/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELLULES ÉPITHÉLIALES DE PIGMENT RÉTINIEN | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2016 | Translation filed | 28.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 19.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2014 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | IT | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IE | 09.10.2020 | LU | 09.10.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.10.2014 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IE | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IE | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
LU | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008129554 (HADASIT MED RES SERVICE [IL], et al) [X] 5,6,9 * page 41 - page 42 * * page 48; claims 16, 17, 22, 33 * [A] 1-4,7,8; | [XAY]US2013196369 (HIKITA SHERRY [US], et al) [X] 5,6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * [A] 9 [Y] 1-4,7,8; | [XA]SG192878 (RIKEN [JP]) [X] 5,6,9 * page 7 - page 8 * * page 34 - page 35; claims 1-3, 6, 7 * [A] 1-4,7,8; | [XA] - YU ZHU ET AL, "Three-Dimensional Neuroepithelial Culture from Human Embryonic Stem Cells and Its Use for Quantitative Conversion to Retinal Pigment Epithelium", PLOS ONE, (20130124), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0054552, page e54552, XP055332448 [X] 5,6,9 * page 10 * [A] 1-4,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0054552 | [XA] - PENG SHAOMIN; QIU CAIHONG; LI LINA; ADELMAN RON A; RIZZOLO LAWRENCE J, "Tight Junctions of RPE Derived from Human Embryonic Stem Cells", ARVO ANNUAL MEETING ABSTRACT SEARCH AND PROGRAM PLANNER, (20110502), XP055197442 [X] 5,6 * abstract * [A] 1-4,7-9 | [XA] - TAKUYA KURODA ET AL, "Highly Sensitive In Vitro Methods for Detection of Residual Undifferentiated Cells in Retinal Pigment Epithelial Cells Derived from Human iPS Cells", PLOS ONE, (20120517), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0037342, page e37342, XP055382467 [X] 5,6 * page 2 * * page 8; table 1 * [A] 1-4,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037342 | [XDA] - TEISHA J. ROWLAND ET AL, "Differentiation of human pluripotent stem cells to retinal pigmented epithelium in defined conditions using purified extracellular matrix proteins", JOURNAL OF TISSUE ENGINEERING AND REGENERATIVE MEDICINE, (20130818), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:10.1002/term.1458, ISSN 1932-6254, pages 642 - 653, XP055121216 [XD] 5,6 * page 643, column l, paragraph 4 - page 644, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 645; table 1 * * page 646, column l * * page 651 * [A] 1-4,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/term.1458 | [YA] - TAKAMICHI MIYAZAKI ET AL, "Laminin E8 fragments support efficient adhesion and expansion of dissociated human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20121204), vol. 3, doi:10.1038/ncomms2231, page 1236, XP055055638 [Y] 1-4,7,8 * page 2, column r * * page 8, column r - page 9, column l * [A] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms2231 | [A] - RODIN SERGEY ET AL, "Long-term self-renewal of human pluripotent stem cells on human recombinant laminin-511", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, GALE GROUP INC, US, (20100601), vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 611 - 615, XP009135150 [A] 1-9 * page 611 - page 612 * * page 614 * | International search | [X]WO2008129554 (HADASIT MED RES SERVICE [IL], et al); | [Y]WO2011043405 (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al); | [X]WO2012115244 (RIKEN [JP], et al); | [X] - PENG SHAOMIN ET AL., "Tight Junctions of RPE Derived from Human Embryonic Stem Cells", VISIONARY GENOMICS, (2011), XP055197442 | [X] - ZHU YU ET AL., "Three-Dimensional Neuroepithelial Culture from Human Embryonic Stem Cells and Its Use for Quantitative Conversion to Retinal Pigment Epithelium", PLOS ONE, (201301), vol. 8, no. 1, page E54552, XP055332448 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0054552 | [X] - KURODA TAKUYA ET AL., "Highly Sensitive In Vitro Methods for Detection of Residual Undifferentiated Cells in Retinal Pigment Epithelial Cells Derived from Human iPS Cells", PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 5, page E37342, XP055332450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037342 | [Y] - KIYOTOSHI SEKIGUCHI, "Tanosei Kansaibo Feeder Free Baiyo Kizai no Kaihatsu", CLINICAL EVALUATION, (201307), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 124 - 127, XP008183598 | [Y] - MIYAZAKI TAKAMICHI ET AL., "Laminin E8 fragments support efficient adhesion and expansion of dissociated human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (2012), vol. 3, pages 1 - 10, XP055055638 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms2231 | [A] - RODIN SERGEY ET AL., "Long-term self-renewal of human pluripotent stem cells on human recombinant laminin-511", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 611 - 615, XP009135150 | Examination | - TAKUYA KURODA ET AL, "Highly Sensitive In Vitro Methods for Detection of Residual Undifferentiated Cells in Retinal Pigment Epithelial Cells Derived from Human iPS Cells", PLOS ONE, (20120517), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0037342, page e37342, XP055382467 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037342 | by applicant | WO2005123902 | WO2011043405 | - PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 5, page E37342 | - NATURE BIOTECH., (201006), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 611 - 5 | - NAT. COMMUN., vol. 3, page 1236 | - J BIOL CHEM., (2009), vol. 284, pages 7820 - 7831 | - J. TISSUE ENG REGEN MED, (2013), vol. 7, pages 642 - 653 | - EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1463 - 1468 | - J. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 105, pages 589 - 598 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 284, pages 7820 - 7831 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 282, pages 11144 - 11154 | - J BIOL CHEM., (20070413), vol. 282, no. 15, pages 11144 - 54 | - IOVS, (200403), vol. 45, no. 3 | - MASATOSHI HARUTA, IOVS, (201111), vol. 52, no. 12 | - OKAMOTO; TAKAHASHI, J. CELL SCIENCE, vol. 122, no. 17 | - FUMITAKA OSAKADA, IOVS, (200802), vol. 49, no. 2 | - JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (20090901), vol. 122, pages 3169 - 79 | - IOVS, (2006), vol. 47, pages 612 - 3624 | - J CELL SCI., (1993), vol. 104, pages 37 - 49 | - THE LANCET, (2012), vol. 379, pages 713 - 720 |