blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3060191

EP3060191 - A DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.05.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.10.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.05.2024  [2024/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jag Mayer Pty Ltd
2/41 Bowen Road
Doncaster East, Victoria 3109 / AU
[2023/23]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
Jag Mayer Pty Ltd
2/41 Bowen Road
Doncaster East, Victoria 3109 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / MAYER, Julie-Anne
2/41 Bowen Road
Doncaster East, Victoria 3109 / AU
02 / MAYER, Glen
2/41 Bowen Road
Doncaster East, Victoria 3109 / AU
03 / HOOWORTH, Allan James
127 Mount Street
Kew, Victoria 3101 / AU
04 / RUSSELL, Michael Edward Philip
12A Airlie Avenue, Prahran
East VIC 3181 / AU
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Atout PI Laplace
Immeuble Up On
25 Boulevard Romain Rolland
CS 40072
75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2023/23]Atout PI Laplace
Immeuble "Visium"
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Former [2016/35]Lucas, Laurent Jacques, et al
Marks & Clerk France
Conseils en Propriété Industrielle
Immeuble Visium
22, Avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14856616.922.10.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014AU01002
Priority number, dateAU2013090407122.10.2013         Original published format: AU 2013904071
AU2013010138522.10.2013         Original published format: AU 2013101385
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015058244
Date:30.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3060191
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3060191
Date:07.06.2023
Language:EN
[2023/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU30.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61J9/04, A61J9/08, B05B11/02, B65D83/76, B05B11/00
[2017/27]
CPC:
A61J9/04 (EP,US); A61J11/002 (EP); B05B11/1094 (EP);
A61J15/0076 (EP); A61J7/0023 (EP); A61J9/085 (EP);
B05B11/0037 (EP,US); B05B11/028 (EP); B05B11/1069 (EP);
B05B11/1074 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2016/35]A61J9/04, A61J9/08, B05B11/02, B65D83/76
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPENDER[2016/35]
English:A DISPENSER[2016/35]
French:DISTRIBUTEUR[2016/35]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2016National basic fee paid 
20.05.2016Search fee paid 
17.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
21.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2022Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2022
13.09.2022Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.10.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2023Fee for grant paid
13.02.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.02.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.03.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
16.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
24.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201805   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2019
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ07.06.2023
ES07.06.2023
HR07.06.2023
PL07.06.2023
RO07.06.2023
RS07.06.2023
SK07.06.2023
SM07.06.2023
GR08.09.2023
IS07.10.2023
[2024/10]
Former [2024/09]CZ07.06.2023
ES07.06.2023
HR07.06.2023
RS07.06.2023
SK07.06.2023
SM07.06.2023
GR08.09.2023
IS07.10.2023
Former [2024/08]ES07.06.2023
HR07.06.2023
RS07.06.2023
SK07.06.2023
SM07.06.2023
GR08.09.2023
Former [2023/51]ES07.06.2023
HR07.06.2023
RS07.06.2023
GR08.09.2023
Former [2023/50]ES07.06.2023
GR08.09.2023
Former [2023/46]ES07.06.2023
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2880913  (PEYRON FRANCOIS A) [X] 1,15 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 19; figures 2, 5 * [I] 2,3,5,10;
 [XI]US4010861  (WELTEN OTTAR TOROLF) [X] 1,2,7,10,15 * column 2, lines 23-66; figures 1-6 * [I] 5,6,11;
 [XI]US4339046  (COEN ROBERT) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11,15 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-4 * [I] 5;
 [Y]US4691847  (FORD JOHN M B [US], et al) [Y] 12-14* column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 41; figures 1, 2 *;
 [XYI]WO9504690  (TATULLI INACIO [BR]) [X] 1-8,10,15 * page 2, line 9 - page 5, line 14; figures 1-10 * [Y] 9,12-14 [I] 11;
 [XI]US6138848  (FERMO PHILIP J [CA]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,15 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-5 * [I] 5,11;
 [Y]WO2005027819  (PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [Y] 9 * page 8, lines 20-30; figures 1, 2 *
International search[A]US1649580  (JULIA GEISLER);
 [X]US3093256  (WOODBURY JR CLIFFORD R);
 [Y]US3108721  (NEBINGER RICHARD B);
 [Y]US4691847  (FORD JOHN M B [US], et al);
 [Y]US5260062  (GAFFAR ABDUL [US]);
 [A]US5269426  (MORANO EMANUEL P [US]);
 [X]CN2151747Y  (ZHANG YUMIN [CN]);
 [X]WO9504690  (TATULLI INACIO [BR]);
 [Y]US2005035078  (LIEBERMAN JOSHUA [US], et al);
 [X]US2006043117  (LAW BRIAN R [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2006060553  (FLEMING LARRY L [US]);
 [Y]US2006097014  (VON SCHUCKMANN ALFRED [DE]);
 [X]EP2011467  (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK [JP], et al);
 [A]US2010193459  (HOUSLEY TODD [US])
ExaminationWO2004002397
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.