EP3064001 - SYNCHRONIZATION OF DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANTELEEV, Sergey Perekhodnikova Street 5-84 Nizhny Novgorod, NIZ, 603065 / RU | 02 /
SHILOV, Mikhail N.Rybakova Street 16-59 Nizhny Novgorod, NIZ, 603054 / RU | 03 /
KHORYAEV, Alexey Rybinskaya Street 75-34 Nizhny Novgorod, NIZ, 603105 / RU | 04 /
CHATTERJEE, Debdeep 1748 Hanchett Ave San Jose, CA 95128 / US | [2018/44] |
Former [2016/36] | 01 /
PANTELEEV, Sergey Perekhodnikova Street 5-84 Nizhny Novgorod 603065 / RU | ||
02 /
SHILOV, Mikhail N.Rybakova Street 16-59 Nizhny Novgorod 603054 / RU | |||
03 /
KHORYAEV, Alexey Rybinskaya Street 75-34 Nizhny Novgorod 603105 / RU | |||
04 /
CHATTERJEE, Debdeep 725 Mariposa Avenue Unit 301 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Keston, Susan Elizabeth HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14858379.2 | 26.09.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US57895 | Priority number, date | US201361898425P | 31.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361898425 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015065631 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064001 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04W4/50 (EP);
H04W72/51 (KR,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04B17/17 (EP);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04J3/1694 (US);
H04L5/0007 (US);
H04L5/0032 (KR);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W28/0215 (US);
H04W28/08 (US);
H04W36/0069 (US);
H04W36/00692 (EP,KR);
H04W4/02 (US);
H04W4/023 (US);
H04W4/60 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W4/90 (US);
H04W48/06 (US);
H04W48/08 (US);
H04W48/12 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W52/346 (US);
H04W56/001 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/002 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W60/02 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W72/52 (US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W74/004 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W76/14 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (US);
H04W8/06 (US);
H04W8/183 (US);
H04W88/02 (KR,US);
H04W88/08 (KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (US);
H04L5/001 (US);
H04W36/305 (EP);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/16 (US);
H04W88/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATION EINER MASCHINE-ZU-MASCHINE-KOMMUNIKATION | [2016/36] | English: | SYNCHRONIZATION OF DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATION | [2016/36] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION DE LA COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 08.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "UE based D2D synchronization scheme", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134536, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717639 [X] 1,10 * pages 1-4 * [I] 2,9 | [A] - ETRI, "Synchronization channels and procedures for out-of-coverage D2D communications", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134333, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717475 [A] 1-10 * pages 1-3 * | International search | [Y]EP1936837 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [A]US2010261469 (RIBEIRO CASSIO BARBOZA [FI], et al); | [Y]US2012096186 (CHANG YAO-TSUNG [TW], et al); | [A]US2013108000 (PARK SEUNG-HOON [KR], et al); | [Y]US2013188546 (TURTINEN SAMULI [FI], et al) |