EP3064013 - RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR D2D DISCOVERY IN AN LTE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Debdeep 2353 Pruneridge Ave Apt 12 Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | 02 /
KHORYAEV, Alexey Chernyakhovskogo Str. 4-14 Nizhegorodskaya Oblast Dzerzhinsk 606016 / RU | 03 /
NIU, Huaning 1308 Knollview Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 04 /
XIONG, Gang 16682 NW Arizona Dr Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14858666.2 | 27.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US62349 | Priority number, date | US201361898425P | 31.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361898425 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015065881 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064013 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L1/18, H04L5/14, H04L5/00, H04W4/00, H04W4/14, H04W72/04, H04W36/00, H04W56/00, H04W76/02, H04W4/02 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H04W4/50 (EP);
H04W72/51 (KR,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04B17/17 (EP);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04J3/1694 (US);
H04L5/0007 (US);
H04L5/0032 (KR);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W28/0215 (US);
H04W28/08 (US);
H04W36/0069 (US);
H04W36/00692 (EP,KR);
H04W4/02 (US);
H04W4/023 (US);
H04W4/60 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W4/90 (US);
H04W48/06 (US);
H04W48/08 (US);
H04W48/12 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W52/346 (US);
H04W56/001 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/002 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W60/02 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W72/52 (US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W74/004 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W76/14 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (US);
H04W8/06 (US);
H04W8/183 (US);
H04W88/02 (KR,US);
H04W88/08 (KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (US);
H04L5/001 (US);
H04W36/305 (EP);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/16 (US);
H04W88/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | H04W72/04, H04W48/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENZUWEISUNG ZUR D2D-ERKENNUNG IN EINEM LTE-NETZWERK | [2016/36] | English: | RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR D2D DISCOVERY IN AN LTE NETWORK | [2016/36] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES POUR DÉCOUVERTE D2D DANS UN RÉSEAU LTE | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 04.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP18159077.9 / EP3346740 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Remaining details of D2D discovery resource allocation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Ljubljana, Slovenia; 20141006 - 20141010, (20141005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143766_INTEL_DISCOVERYRA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20141005), XP050875087 [XP] 1,10-14 * Sections 1-3 * [I] 2-9,15 | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "On Resource Allocation and System Operation for D2D Discovery", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134141 - INTEL - DISCOVERY RESOURCE ALLOCATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717331 [A] 1-15 * Sections 1, 3-4 * | [A] - ASUSTEK, "Method of resource allocation for D2D discovery", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134638 METHOD OF RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR D2D DISCOVERY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717720 [A] 1-15 * Sections 1-4 * | International search | [A]WO2012159270 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al); | [Y] - HTC, "Inter-corresponding sets of resources for D2D discovery", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #74BIS,R1-134365, GUANGZHOU, CHINA, (20131007), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/wg1_rl1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/R1-134365.zip, XP050717507 | [Y] - ALCATEL -LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL., "Resource Allocation for D2D Discovery", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #74BIS,R1-134232, GUANGZHOU, CHINA, (20131007), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/wg1_rl1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/R1-134232.zip, XP050717415 | [A] - CATT, "Further discussion on resource allocation for D2D discovery", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #74BIS,R1-134116, GUANGZHOU, CHINA, (20131007), URL: httplllwww.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/wg1_rl1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/Rl-134116.zip, XP050717307 | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "On Resource Allocation and System Operation for D2D Discovery", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #74BIS,R1-134141, GUANGZHOU, CHINA, (20131007), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/wg1_rl1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/R1-134141.zip, XP050717331 |