EP3076072 - LED LIGHTING FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gigatera Inc. 3, Dongtansandan 6-gil Dongtan-myeon, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18487 / KR | [2018/20] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states KMW Inc. 65, Yeongcheon-ri Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyronggi-do 445-813 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Duk Yong 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Byung Ju 20 Jangja-ro Namdong-gu Incheon 405-250 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyun Ki (Sangdo-dong Hyndai Apt.) 106-1501 421 Sangdo-ro, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-781 / KR | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14864495.8 | 21.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014KR11290 | Priority number, date | KR20130142968 | 22.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130142968 | KR20140015569 | 11.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140015569 | [2016/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015076625 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076072 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21V21/30, // F21Y115/10 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
F21V7/0008 (EP);
F21V29/00 (RU);
F21S2/00 (RU);
F21S8/08 (EP);
F21V7/0016 (EP);
F21V21/30 (EP);
F21V23/023 (EP);
F21V23/026 (EP);
F21V29/76 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | F21V29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | LED-LEUCHTE | [2016/40] | English: | LED LIGHTING FIXTURE | [2016/40] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DEL | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2016 | Translation filed | 22.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 05.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2233831 (NICHIA CORP [JP]); | [I]JP2011044348 (ASAGI CREATE KK, et al); | [XI]WO2012166347 (MUSCO CORP [US], et al); | [XI]US2013141906 (WANG YINGHUA [CN], et al); | [XI]WO2013085244 (SEOUL SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [XAI]US2013223069 (KIM KYUNG HWAN [KR]) | International search | [X]JP2011044348 (ASAGI CREATE KK, et al); | [A]KR101045022B (CHARMING FLAME [KR]); | [Y]KR20120129737 ; | [A]US2013141906 (WANG YINGHUA [CN], et al); | [Y]US2013223069 (KIM KYUNG HWAN [KR]) | by applicant | KR200451090Y |