EP3086004 - CYLINDER HEAD GASKET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Takeo c/o NOK CORPORATION 590-1 Jitogata Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0532 / JP | 02 /
GUSHIKEN, Misaki c/o NOK CORPORATION 590-1 Jitogata Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0532 / JP | 03 /
OSAWA, Namieki c/o NOK CORPORATION 590-1 Jitogata Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0532 / JP | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14872304.2 | 10.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014JP82678 | Priority number, date | JP20130261021 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013261021 | [2016/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015093368 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086004 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3086004 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08, F02F11/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
F02F11/002 (EP,US);
F02F1/10 (US);
F02F1/24 (US);
F16J15/0825 (EP,US);
F02F2200/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDERKOPFDICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/43] | English: | CYLINDER HEAD GASKET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2016/43] | French: | JOINT DE CULASSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2016 | Translation filed | 07.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 18.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2014 | AL | 14.02.2018 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | IT | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.12.2014 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6336639 (ISHIDA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 6-10, 13, 15-18 * * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 6 * * column 11, line 47 - column 11, line 53 * * column 14, line 37 - column 14, line 45 * * column 14, line 66 - column 15, line 6 *; | [X]WO2009022635 (ELRINGKLINGER MARUSAN CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]EP1457718 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0004] , [ 0010] , [ 0027] - [0029] *; | [X]EP0369033 (TERAI TOSHIMITSU) [X] 1,2 * figures 7, 8, 13 * * page 3, line 16 - page 3, line 23 * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 16 * * claim 5 *; | [X]US6139025 (MIYAOH YOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 51 - column 1, line 54 * * column 1, line 62 - column 1, line 63 * * column 3, line 38 - column 3, line 40 * * column 5, line 4 - column 5, line 6 *; | [X]US2006097460 (UDAGAWA TSUNEKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1, 6 * * paragraphs [0037] , [ 0038] *; | [X]EP1672255 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0005] * | International search | [X]JP2006161915 (ISHIKAWA GASKET); | [A]JPH1193763 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [A]JPH0573361U (ISHIKAWA GASKET CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JP2006342749 |