EP3086671 - VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/44] | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
[2018/33] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juul Labs International Inc. 560 20th Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2020/40] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Juul Labs UK Holdco Limited Suite 1, 3rd Floor 11 - 12 St. James's Square London SW1Y 4LB / GB | ||
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Juul Labs, Inc. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | ||
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Juul Labs, Inc. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107-4344 / US | ||
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states Juul Labs, Inc. 660 Alabama Street, 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | ||
Former [2016/44] | For all designated states PAX Labs, Inc. 660 Alabama Street, 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONSEES, James 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
BOWEN, Adam 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
HATTON, Cole 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Steven 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 05 /
ATKINS, Ariel 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 06 /
LOMELI, Kevin 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 07 /
HIBMACRONAN, Christopher Nicholas 582 6th Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 08 /
MORENSTEIN, Joshua 582 6th Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2018/38] |
Former [2016/44] | 01 /
MONSEES, James 660 Alabama Street 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | ||
02 /
BOWEN, Adam 660 Alabama Street 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
03 /
HATTON, Cole 660 Alabama Street 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Steven 660 Alabama Street 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
05 /
ATKINS, Ariel 660 Alabama Street 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
06 /
LOMELI, Kevin 660 Alabama Street 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/44] | Branscombe, Adam Douglas, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14873186.2 | 23.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014US72230 | Priority number, date | US201361920225P | 23.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361920225 P | US201461936593P | 06.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461936593 P | US201461937755P | 10.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461937755 P | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015100361 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086671 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3086671 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61M15/06, H05B1/02, A61M11/04 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (IL,KR);
H05B1/0244 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24B15/167 (GB,IL);
A24F40/10 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,GB,IL,US);
A24F40/42 (IL,KR,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,IL);
A24F40/51 (IL,KR);
A24F40/53 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/57 (IL,KR);
A24F40/95 (IL,KR);
A61M11/042 (EP,GB,IL,US);
A61M15/0015 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/0016 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/002 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/0021 (IL,KR);
H01R13/6205 (GB,IL);
H01R31/06 (GB,IL);
H02J7/00 (IL,US);
H02J7/00309 (EP,GB,IL);
H02J7/0034 (EP,IL,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,GB,IL,US);
H05B1/0202 (IL,KR);
H05B1/0227 (GB,IL);
H05B3/04 (GB,IL);
H05B3/44 (GB,IL);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2016/0024 (IL,KR);
A61M2205/128 (EP,IL);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3606 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M2205/8237 (EP,IL,US);
H05B2203/021 (IL,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | A24F1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR EINE VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/33] | English: | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS | [2018/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈMES DE VAPORISATION | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/44] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/44] | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2016/44] | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE VAPORISATION | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18000692.6 / EP3430921 | EP19153728.1 / EP3498115 | EP19153737.2 / EP3491948 | EP19157414.4 / EP3508080 | EP19157427.6 / EP3504989 | EP19157439.1 / EP3504990 | EP19157450.8 / EP3513673 | EP19157461.5 / EP3504991 | EP21184006.1 / EP3928646 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Fontem Ventures B.V. Radarweg 60 1043 NT Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | 02
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE KELTIE LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB Opponent's representative Moore, Michael Richard, et al, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2019/31] | 26.07.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.04.2021 | 14.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/32] | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | LU | 23.12.2018 | MT | 23.12.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013034453 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]WO2013083631 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013083634 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2013155645 (RUYAN INVESTMENT HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US2004099266 (CROSS STEPHEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2007074734 (BRAUNSHTEYN MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US2007144514 (YEATES DONOVAN B [US], et al); | [Y]US2008029095 (ESSER RALF [DE]); | [Y]US2009151717 (BOWEN ADAM [US], et al); | [Y]US2011192397 (SASKAR MATTHEW [GB], et al); | [Y]US2012199146 (MARANGOS BILL [CA]); | [A]US2013042865 (MONSEES JAMES [US], et al); | [X]WO2013083635 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [Y]EP2609821 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [Y]US2013255702 (GRIFFITH JR DAVID WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]US2013333700 (BUCHBERGER HELMUT [AT]) | by applicant | WO2013034453 | WO2013083631 | WO2013083634 | WO2013155654 | Opposition | US2011226236 | EP2460424 | EP2489391 | US2013037041 | WO2013034456 | WO2013045582 | EP2606756 | WO2013098395 | WO2013116567 | KR20130106741 | KR20130107658 | WO2013159245 | CN203353689U | US2014007891 | US2014072230 | WO2014151040 | WO2014150979 | WO2015100361 | EP3086671 | WO2013083631 | WO2014139610 | WO2015073564 | GB2560653 | - VUSE Device (public Art. 54 (2), Art. 56 Prior use prior use) EPC 08/2013 |