EP3089148 - PIXEL DRIVING CIRCUIT, ARRAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND PIXEL DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Hefei BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2177, Tonglingbei Rd. Hefei New Railway Station District Hefei, Anhui 230012 / CN | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Zuquan No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
GONG, Weigang No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 14875585.3 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014CN78778 | Priority number, date | CN201310746150 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310746150 | [2016/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015096390 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3089148 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/3233 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/3258 (US);
G09G3/3291 (US);
G09G2300/0809 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0202 (US);
G09G2310/0262 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | G09G3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | PIXELTREIBERSCHALTUNG, ARRAYSUBSTRAT, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND PIXELANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/44] | English: | PIXEL DRIVING CIRCUIT, ARRAY SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND PIXEL DRIVING METHOD | [2016/44] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE PIXEL, SUBSTRAT DE MATRICE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE DE PIXEL | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2016 | Translation filed | 08.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 19.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003112208 (OKABE MASASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0030]; figures 3,10 *[I] 5; | [XI]US2012327064 (QI XIAOJING [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0046]; figures 5,10 * [I] 5 | International search | [A]US2007176887 (UEHARA SHIN-ICHI [JP], et al); | [A]CN102117592 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD); | [A]CN102708793 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN102930813 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [X]CN103310728 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [XP]CN103700346 (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al) |