EP3143094 - DISPERSION OF HOMOPOLYMER OF VINYL CHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magink Comércio De Imagem Gráfica Ltda - ME Av. Interlagos 2001 - Conjunto 71 04661-100 São Paulo, SP / BR | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVA GARCIA, Carlos Julio Av. Interlagos 2001 - Conjunto 71 04661-100 São Paulo, SP / BR | 02 /
SILVA GARCIA, Leon Dario Av. Interlagos 2001 - Conjunto 71 04661-100 São Paulo, SP / BR | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Ferreira Magno, Fernando Antonio A.G. da Cunha Ferreira, Lda. Avenida José Gomes Ferreira 15, 3rd floor L 1495-139 Algés / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 72 1° 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 14891836.0 | 13.05.2014 | [2017/12] | WO2014IB61404 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015173608 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143094 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J127/06, C09J4/06, C08F259/04, C08K5/10, C09J171/02, // C08L27/06, C08L71/02 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
C09J127/06 (EP,US);
C08J3/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/12 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C09J171/02 (EP,US);
C08J2327/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J127/06, C08K5/103, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C09J127/06, C08K5/12, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
C09J171/02, C08K5/103, C08L27/06 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | C09J127/06, C08L27/06, C09J4/06, C08F259/04, C08K5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | DISPERSION EINES HOMOPOLYMERS VON VINYLCHLORID | [2017/12] | English: | DISPERSION OF HOMOPOLYMER OF VINYL CHLORIDE | [2017/12] | French: | DISPERSION D'HOMOPOLYMÈRE DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 23.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/19] | 27.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5714030 (KITAMURA IWAO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-4 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2010010127 (BARKI ANDRES COHEN [MX], et al) [A] 1-4 * examples 4-6; table 3 *; | [A]WO2013173447 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US]) [A] 1-4* claims 4,5,7,8 * | International search | [A]US3414534 (JACKSON HUITSON JOHN, et al) [A] 1)-4) * ; entire document 1 *; | [Y]US6342561 (ENGEL MICHAEL R [US], et al) [Y] 4) * : abstract: column 3. lines 8-15 *; | [Y]US2003139317 (BEHLER ANSGAR [DE], et al) [Y] 1)-4) * ; abstract; paragraphs [0019]-[0020] 1 *; | [Y]US6727305 (PAVEZ ARANGUIZ ROBERTO [CL]) [Y] 3) * ; table 2; daim 1 *; | [Y]US6797753 (BENECKE HERMAN P [US], et al) [Y] 1)-4) * ; abstract; column 4, lines 3-4; 1 column 5, lines 59-65; column 14, lines 21-25; daim 1 *; | [Y]CN1691895 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [Y] 3) * ; see machine translation; claim 1 *; | [A]US2009149586 (DE QUADROS JUNIOR JACYR VIANNA [BR], et al) [A] 1)-4) * ; entire document - 1 *; | [Y]US7741395 (HOLT MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1)-4) * ; column 2, lines 31-36; column 3, lines 21-25; 1 column 4, lines 54-61, 64-66; column 5, lines 7-10; claim 14 *; | [Y]US2011206766 (FRIEDL THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 2) * ; column 12, lines 19-20, 41-44 claim 1 *; | [A]US2011272174 (CHAUDHARY BHARAT I [US]) [A] 1)-4)* ; entire document 1 * | by applicant | US4525234 | US4613639 | US5714030 | US2008293854 | US2011111238 |