EP3219360 - HIGH POWER VCSEL LASER TREATMENT DEVICE WITH SKIN COOLING FUNCTION AND PACKAGING STRUCTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanhe Laserconn Tech Co., Ltd. Floor 5, Building G, No.10 Chaobai Street Yanjiao Sanhe Hebei 065201 / CN | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yang Room 2-606 Floor 6 Building 25 No.9 Anningzhuang W.St. Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LI, Delong Room 2-606 Floor 6 Building 25 No.9 Anningzhuang W.St. Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 14905708.5 | 07.12.2014 | [2017/38] | WO2014CN93209 | Priority number, date | CN201410643581 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410643581 | CN201420680028U | 10.11.2014 Original published format: CN 201420680028 U | CN201410643997 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410643997 | CN201420681459U | 10.11.2014 Original published format: CN 201420681459 U | [2017/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016074300 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219360 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3219360 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/00 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,US);
A61N5/00 (EP,US);
A61N5/0616 (EP,US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00005 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0047 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,US);
A61N2005/007 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0652 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0665 (EP,US);
H01S5/02326 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTARKE VCSEL-LASERBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT HAUTKÜHLFUNKTION UND VERPACKUNGSSTRUKTUR DAFÜR | [2017/38] | English: | HIGH POWER VCSEL LASER TREATMENT DEVICE WITH SKIN COOLING FUNCTION AND PACKAGING STRUCTURE THEREOF | [2017/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT LASER VCSEL HAUTE PUISSANCE À FONCTION DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE LA PEAU ET SA STRUCTURE D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2017 | Translation filed | 09.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 09.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2014 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | GB | 07.12.2020 | IE | 07.12.2020 | LU | 07.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 07.12.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
GB | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN203555822U (ORIENTAL LASER BEIJING CO LTD) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]WO2014079374 (XI AN FOCUSLIGHT TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]US2014218898 (SEURIN JEAN F [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0003]; figures 4,7,9,13-16 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0106] *; | EP2923668 [ ] (XI AN FOCUSLIGHT TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0032]; claims 1-10 * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0031] * | International search | [X]US5538919 (LEBBY MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 11-20 * , description, column 4, line 5 to column 5, line 8, and figure 4 *; | [A]CN2514529Y (ELECTRONIC INST NO 13 MINISTRY [CN]) [A] 1-20 * , claim 1, and figure 1 *; | [A]US2006274807 (CHO SOO-HAENG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN201430345Y (UNIV NORTH CHINA) [A] 1-20* , the whole document * |