EP3224705 - DETECTION OF USER INTERFACE LAYOUT CHANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIEGEL, Ofer Altalef St. No. 5 Shabazi St. No. 26 56100 Yehud / IL | 02 /
NAKACHE, Gil Altalef St. No. 5 Shabazi St. No. 26 56100 Yehud / IL | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14906888.4 | 24.11.2014 | [2017/40] | WO2014US67071 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016085445 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224705 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/451, G06F8/71, G06F17/21, G06F9/445, G06F3/0481 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F40/106 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F8/71 (US);
G06F9/44505 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | G06F3/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON VERÄNDERUNGEN DES LAYOUTS VON BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLEN | [2017/40] | English: | DETECTION OF USER INTERFACE LAYOUT CHANGES | [2017/40] | French: | DÉTECTION DE CHANGEMENTS DE DISPOSITION D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006279571 (MORI NOBUYOSHI [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 6,10,11,14; | [A]US7716164 (STUHEC GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 9 - line 37 ** column 4, line 39 - column 18, line 9 *; | [XI]US2014052821 (PRASAD MUKUL R [US]) [X] 1-3,7-13 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0108] * [I] 4-6,14,15 | International search | [A]US2005177772 (DERKS PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0005], [0027]; and figure 3. *; | [A]US2005289495 (RAGHUNANDRAN MAKARAM [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0028]; and figure 2. *; | [A]WO2008112605 (MENTOR GRAPHICS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0041]; and figure 3. *; | [X]US2009089733 (CHANG CHEN-YUN [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0010], [0020], [0024]-[0026], [0030]; and figures 1-2, 4. *; | [A]US2014129910 (KOTA GERGELY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraph [0003]; and figure 1. * |