|
20.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
14.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
13.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2024 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2024 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.05.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.01.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.10.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.09.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.08.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.10.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.08.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
76 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |