blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2886743

EP2886743 - Concrete lagging, method for their manufacture and application thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johns Manville Europe GmbH
Max-Fischer-Strasse 11
86399 Bobingen / DE
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Ketzer, Michael
Hainbuchstraße 64
97903 Collenberg / DE
02 / Gleich, Klaus Friedrich
9637 Timber Hawk Circle
Apt. 22
Highlands Ranch, CO Colorado 80126 / US
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Mai Besier
European Trademark Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Kreuzberger Ring 18a
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Mai, Dörr, Besier
Patentanwälte
Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date15151632.507.01.2010
[2015/26]
Priority number, dateDE2009100457314.01.2009         Original published format: DE102009004573
[2015/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886743
Date:24.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:E04G9/10, B28B7/36, B32B37/02
[2015/26]
CPC:
E04G9/10 (EP); B28B7/0064 (EP); B28B7/368 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
TitleGerman:Betonschalung, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung[2015/26]
English:Concrete lagging, method for their manufacture and application thereof[2015/26]
French:Coffrage en béton, son procédé de fabrication et d'utilisation[2015/26]
Examination procedure28.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
08.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/45]
02.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/45]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10000059.5  / EP2208836
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6331339  (KAJANDER RICHARD EMIL [US]) [X] 1-5,16,17 * the whole document * [Y] 6-15;
 [XY]DE102007008424  (JOHNS MANVILLE EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,17 * the whole document * [Y] 6-15;
 [A]EP0429752  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4730805
 US4856754
 EP0429752
 EP0446822
 EP0590629
 US5837620
 US6303207
 US6331339
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.