EP3048256 - Rotor comprising a turbine blade with a locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehnsch, Andreas Humboldtstr. 249 45149 Essen / DE | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 15151806.5 | 20.01.2015 | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048256 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/32 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
F01D5/323 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01D5/32 (RU);
F01D11/005 (EP);
F01D5/30 (RU);
F01D5/3015 (US);
F01D5/326 (EP);
F04D29/34 (RU);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rotor umfassend eine Turbinenschaufel mit einer Sicherungseinrichtung | [2016/30] | English: | Rotor comprising a turbine blade with a locking device | [2016/30] | French: | Rotor comportant une aube de turbine avec un dispositif de verrouillage | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2847187 (MURPHY GEORGE B); | [Y]US4668167 (LE MAOUT THEOPHILE F [FR], et al); | [X]US5431543 (BROWN WILMOTT G [US], et al); | [XY]EP2299060 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |