EP2901897 - Shower door assembly display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/32] | SHOWER DOOR ASSEMBLY DISPLAY | ||
[2015/40] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liberty Hardware Manufacturing Corporation 140 Business Park Drive Winston-Salem, NC 27107 / US | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Austen III, James Allen 316 Woodrow Avenue High Point, NC North Carolina 27262 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 15152840.3 | 28.01.2015 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | US201414167230 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: US201414167230 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2901897 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2901897 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47F7/00, E06B3/46, A47K3/34, // A47K3/30 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
A47F7/0042 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | A47F7/00, // A47K3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Duschtüranordnungsverkaufsständer | [2015/40] | English: | Shower door assembly display | [2015/40] | French: | Présentoir d'ensemble de porte de douche | [2015/40] |
Former [2015/32] | DUSCHTÜRANORDNUNGSVERKAUFSSTÄNDER | ||
Former [2015/32] | SHOWER DOOR ASSEMBLY DISPLAY | ||
Former [2015/32] | PRÉSENTOIR D'ENSEMBLE DE PORTE DE DOUCHE | Examination procedure | 09.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 24.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3359573 (CASEBOLT RALPH T) [I] 17-19 * column 4, line 3 - line 28 ** column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 5 *; | [X]US2013325670 (AUSTIN III JAMES ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * |