Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2924047

EP2924047 - VACCINE CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2017New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOMAY AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Wien / AT
[2015/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Valenta, Rudolf
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
02 / Focke-Tejkl, Margarete
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
03 / Linhart, Birgit
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
04 / Vrtala, Susanne
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
05 / Valent, Peter
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
06 / Reininger, Renate
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
07 / Spitzauer, Susanne
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
08 / Swoboda, Ines
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
09 / Van Hage, Marianne
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
10 / Grönlund, Hans
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
11 / Tinhofer, Johanna
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
12 / Westritschnig, Kerstin
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
13 / Popow-Kraupp, Theresia
Biomay AG
Lazarettgasse 19 Top 1
1090 Vienna / AT
 [2015/40]
Representative(s)KLIMENT & HENHAPEL
Patentanwälte OG Singerstrasse 8/3/9
1010 Wien / AT
[2015/40]
Application number, filing date15161237.111.06.2007
[2015/40]
Priority number, dateAT2006000099409.06.2006         Original published format: AT 9942006
[2015/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2924047
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/415, A61K39/36, C07K19/00
[2015/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2015/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesHRNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMPFSTOFFTRÄGER[2015/40]
English:VACCINE CARRIER[2015/40]
French:SUPPORT DE VACCIN[2015/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
17.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07718492.7  / EP2035457
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004108758  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2 - page 4; claims 1-20; tables 2,3 *;
 [Y]EP1219301  (SHAN BETEILIGUNGSGESELLSCHAFT [AT]) [Y] 1-15 * page 11; claims 1,4,7-12,16 *;
 [Y]DE10351471  (WIEDERMANN-SCHMIDT URSULA [AT]) [Y] 1-15 * Phl p 5/1; page 13 - page 16; tables 2,3 *;
 [YD]WO2004003143  (ALLNUTT F C THOMAS [US], et al) [YD] 5-10 * example 7; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]WO9534578  (PHARMACIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 6-8,11 *;
 [A]US2003077290  (VALENTA RUDOLF [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4 - page 8; claims 1-18 *;
 [XP]WO2007031080  (ALK ABELLO AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1,11-14 * sequence: adlgygpatpaapaagytpatpaapagadaagk (figure 2 d, peptide 1) *
 [Y]  - SCHRAMM G ET AL, "Allergen engineering: variants of the timothy grass pollen allergen Phl p 5b with reduced IgE-binding capacity but conserved T cell reactivity", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19990215), vol. 162, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2406 - 2414, XP002216586 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PETERSEN A ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF ISOFORMS OF THE MAJOR ALLERGEN PHL P V BY TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMMUNOBLOTTING AND MICROSEQUENCING", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, KARGER AG, CH, (19920101), vol. 98, no. 2, ISSN 1018-2438, pages 105 - 109, XP009146931 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
    [] - Petersen A et al, DATABASE UniProt, (20000501), Database accession no. Q9S8Y0, XP002742633 [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - H. KAHLERT ET AL, "Measurement of basophil-activating capacity of grass pollen allergens, allergoids and hypoallergenic recombinant derivatives by flow cytometry using anti-CD203c", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (20030901), vol. 33, no. 9, doi:10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01756.x, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 1266 - 1272, XP055039285 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1267 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01756.x
by applicantWO2004004761
 WO2004003143
 WO2004065414
 US5807715
 US4816567
 US4816397
 US5585089
 EP0239400
 WO9109967
 US5225539
 US5530101
 EP0592106
 EP0519596
 US5565332
    - BOHLE B. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 172, no. 11, pages 6642 - 6648,
    - BERCOVICI N. ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 7, pages 859 - 864,
    - TATUSOVA ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 174, pages 247 - 25,
    - CORPET F, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 10881 - 10890,
    - LINHART B; VALENTA R, INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 134, pages 324 - 31,
    - MARSH, D.G.; L.R. FREIDHOFF, ALBE, an allergen database, Edition 1.0, IUIS, (1992),
    - MARSH, D. G. ET AL., "Allergen nomenclature", BULL WHO, (1986), vol. 64, pages 767 - 770,
    - KING, T.P. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1964), vol. 3, pages 458 - 468,
    - LOWENSTEIN, H., ALLERGY, (1980), vol. 35, pages 188 - 191,
    - AUKRUST, L., ALLERGY, (1980), vol. 35, pages 206 - 207,
    - DEMEREC, M. ET AL., GENETICS, (1966), vol. 54, pages 61 - 75,
    - BODMER, J. G. ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1991), vol. 33, pages 301 - 309,
    - GRIFFITH, I.J. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY APPL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 96, pages 296 - 304,
    - ROEBBER, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 134, pages 3062 - 3069,
    - METZLER, W. J. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, pages 5117 - 5127,
    - METZLER, W. J. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, pages 8697 - 8705,
    - GOODFRIEND, L. ET AL., FED. PROC., (1979), vol. 38, page 1415,
    - EKRAMODDOULLAH, A. K. M. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1982), vol. 19, pages 1527 - 1534,
    - ANSARI, A. A. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 80, pages 229 - 235,
    - MORGENSTERN, J.P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 9690 - 9694,
    - GRIFFITH, I.J. ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 113, pages 263 - 268,
    - WEBER, A. ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL., (1986), vol. 83B, pages 321 - 324,
    - WEBER, A. ET AL., ALLERGY, (1987), vol. 42, pages 464 - 470,
    - STANWORTH, D. R. ET AL., BULLETIN WHO, (1990), vol. 68, pages 109 - 111,
    - RAFNAR, T. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 1229 - 1236,
    - ROGERS, B.L. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 2547 - 2552,
    - KLAPPER, D.G. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1980), vol. 19, pages 5729 - 5734,
    - GHOSH, B. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 5391 - 5399,
    - ROEBBER, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1983), vol. 131, pages 706 - 711,
    - LUBAHN, B.; D.G. KLAPPER, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, page 338,
    - ROEBBER, M.; D.G. MARSH., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 87, page 324,
    - GOODFRIEND L. ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (1985), vol. 22, pages 899 - 906,
    - HIMLY M. ET AL., FASEB J, (2003), vol. 17, pages 106 - 108,
    - NILSEN, B. M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 2660 - 2668,
    - WOPFNER N. ET AL., BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 383, pages 1779 - 1789,
    - JIMENEZ A. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 105, pages 297 - 307,
    - BARDERAS R. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 127, pages 47 - 54,
    - CARNES J. ET AL., ALLERGY, (2001), vol. 56, no. 68, page 274,
    - GIULIANI A. ET AL., ALLERGY, (1987), vol. 42, pages 434 - 440,
    - SMITH,P.M. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 98, pages 331 - 343,
    - SUPHIOGLU,C. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1997), vol. 402, pages 167 - 172,
    - ASTURIAS J.A. ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1997), vol. 27, pages 1307 - 1313,
    - MECHERI, S. ET AL., ALLERGY APPL. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 78, pages 283 - 289,
    - ROBERTS, A.M. ET AL., ALLERGY, (1993), vol. 48, pages 615 - 623,
    - GUERIN-MARCHAND,C. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 33, pages 797 - 806,
    - KLYSNER, S. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1992), vol. 22, pages 491 - 497,
    - PEREZ, M. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 16210 - 16215,
    - GRIFFITH, 1. J. ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1991), vol. 279, pages 210 - 215,
    - ANSARI, A. A. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 11181 - 11185,
    - SIDOLI,A. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 21819 - 21825,
    - ANSARI, A. A. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, pages 8665 - 8670,
    - SINGH, M. B. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1991), vol. 88, pages 1384 - 1388,
    - VAN REE R. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 95, pages 970 - 978,
    - SUPHIOGLU,C.; SINGH,M.B., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1995), vol. 25, pages 853 - 865,
    - DOLECEK,C. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1993), vol. 335, pages 299 - 304,
    - FISCHER S. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 98, pages 189 - 198,
    - MATTHIESEN, F.; H. LOWENSTEIN, CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1991), vol. 21, pages 297 - 307,
    - PETERSEN,A. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 108, pages 55 - 59,
    - MARKNELL DEWITT A. ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2002), vol. 32, pages 1329 - 1340,
    - VALENTA,R. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 199, pages 106 - 118,
    - ESCH, R. E.; D. G. KLAPPER, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 26, pages 557 - 561,
    - OLSEN, E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 205 - 211,
    - AVJIOGLU, A. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, page 340,
    - KOS T. ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1993), vol. 196, pages 1086 - 92,
    - DIAZ-PERALES A. ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 30, pages 1403 - 1410,
    - IPSEN, H.; O.C. HANSEN, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 1279 - 1288,
    - TANIAI, M. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1988), vol. 239, pages 329 - 332,
    - GRIFFITH, I.J. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, page 339,
    - SAKAGUCHI, M. ET AL., ALLERGY, (1990), vol. 45, pages 309 - 312,
    - YOKOYAMA M. ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2000), vol. 275, pages 195 - 202,
    - MIDORO-HORIUTI T. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 164, pages 2188 - 2192,
    - TINGHINO R. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 101, pages 772 - 777,
    - GROSS GN ET AL., SCAND J IMMUNOL, (1978), vol. 8, pages 437 - 441,
    - OBISPO TM ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1993), vol. 23, pages 311 - 316,
    - MIDORO-HORIUTI T. ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2001), vol. 31, pages 771 - 778,
    - LOMBARDERO M. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1994), vol. 24, pages 765 - 770,
    - VILLALBA, M. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 216, pages 863 - 869,
    - ASTURIAS JA ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 100, pages 365 - 372,
    - BATANERO E. ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1996), vol. 241, pages 772 - 778,
    - BATANERO E. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1997), vol. 410, pages 293 - 296,
    - TEJERA ML ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 104, pages 797 - 802,
    - LEDESMA A. ET AL., FEBS LETT, (2000), vol. 466, pages 192 - 196,
    - BARRAL P. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 172, pages 3644 - 3651,
    - YI FC ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2002), vol. 32, pages 1203 - 1210,
    - RAMOS JD ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 126, pages 286 - 293,
    - CHUA, K. Y. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1988), vol. 167, pages 175 - 182,
    - CHUA, K. Y. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY APPL. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 91, pages 118 - 123,
    - SMITH AM ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 124, pages 61 - 63,
    - SMITH AM ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 977 - 984,
    - SMITH WA; THOMAS WR., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, vol. 109, pages 133 - 140,
    - LAKE, F.R. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 87, pages 1035 - 1042,
    - TOVEY, E. R. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1989), vol. 170, pages 1457 - 1462,
    - YASUEDA, H., T. SHIDA, T. ANDO, S. SUGIYAMA, AND H. YAMAKAWA, "Allergenic and proteolytic properties of fourth allergens from Dermatophagoides mites", YASUEDA, H., T. SHIDA, T. ANDO, S. SUGIYAMA, AND H. YAMAKAWA, A. TODT, Dust Mite Allergens and Asthma. Report of the 2nd international workshop, UCB INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY, (1991), pages 63 - 64,
    - SHEN, H.-D. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1993), vol. 23, pages 934 - 940,
    - O'NEIL GM ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1994), vol. 1219, pages 521 - 528,
    - KING C. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 98, pages 739 - 747,
    - LIND P. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 140, pages 4256 - 4262,
    - DILWORTH, R. J. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1991), vol. 21, pages 25 - 32,
    - NISHIYAMA, C. ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 101, pages 159 - 166,
    - TRUDINGER, M. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1991), vol. 21, pages 33 - 38,
    - SHEN HD ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1995), vol. 25, pages 1000 - 1006,
    - TATEGAKI A. ET AL., ACI INTERNATIONAL SUPPL., (2000), vol. 1, pages 74 - 76,
    - AKI T. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 96, pages 74 - 83,
    - TSAI L. ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1999), vol. 29, pages 1606 - 1613,
    - GAFVELIN G. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 511 - 518,
    - VAN HAGE-HAMSTEN. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, page 353,
    - VARELA J. ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1994), vol. 225, pages 93 - 98,
    - SCHMIDT M. ET AL., FEBS LETT, (1995), vol. 370, pages 11 - 14,
    - ERIKSSON TLJ ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 268, pages 287 - 294,
    - SAARNE T. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 130, pages 258 - 265,
    - ERIKSSON TL ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 251, no. 1-2, pages 443 - 447,
    - RAUTIAINEN J; RYTKONEN M; PELKONEN J; PENTIKAINEN J; PEROLA 0; VIRTANEN T; ZEILER T, "Mantyjarvi R.", BDA20, A MAJOR BOVINE DANDER ALLERGEN CHARACTERISED AT THE SEQUENCE LEVEL IS BOS D 2,
    - GJESING B; LOWENSTEIN H., ANN ALLERGY, (1984), vol. 53, page 602,
    - DE GROOT, H. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 87, pages 1056 - 1065,
    - KONIECZNY, A., Personal communication, IMMUNOLOGIC PHARMACEUTICAL CORP.,
    - BULONE, V., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1998), vol. 253, pages 202 - 211,
    - DANDEU J. P. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR., (1993), vol. 621, pages 23 - 31,
    - GOUBRAN BOTROS H. ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. B, (1998), vol. 710, pages 57 - 65,
    - HILGER C. ET AL., ALLERGY, vol. 52, pages 179 - 187,
    - GENE, (1996), vol. 169, pages 295 - 296,
    - ICHIKAWA K. ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2001),
    - FAHLBUSCH B. ET AL., ALLERGY, (2002), vol. 57, pages 417 - 422,
    - MCDONALD, B. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 83, page 251,
    - CLARKE, A. J. ET AL., EMBO J, (1984), vol. 3, pages 1045 - 1052,
    - LONGBOTTOM, J. L., Characterisation of allergens from the urines of experimental animals, MCMILLAN PRESS, (1983), pages 525 - 529,
    - LAPERCHE, Y. ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 32, pages 453 - 460,
    - BUSH RK ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 104, pages 665 - 671,
    - AUKRUST L; BORCH SM., INT ARCH ALLERGY APPL IMMUNOL, (1979), vol. 60, pages 68 - 79,
    - SWARD-NORDMO M. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY APPL IMMUNOL, (1988), vol. 85, pages 288 - 294,
    - SHEN ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 103, page S157,
    - "Epidemiology and molecular basis of the involvement of Aspergillus fumigatus in allergic diseases", CRAMERI R., Contrib. Microbiol., KARGER, vol. 2,
    - SHEN HD ET AL., "Vacuolar serine proteinase: A major allergen of Aspergillus fumigatus", 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1998),
    - KUMAR A. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, pages 1024 - 1030,
    - SAXENA S. ET AL., CLIN EXP IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 134, pages 86 - 91,
    - BAUR X. ET AL., ALLERGY, (2002), vol. 57, pages 943 - 945,
    - SHEN HD ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1996), vol. 26, pages 444 - 451,
    - SHEN ET AL., ABSTRACT; THE XVIII CONGRESS OF THE EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF ALLERGOLOGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, BRUSSELS, BELGIUM, page 19990703,
    - SHEN HD ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1999), vol. 29, pages 642 - 651,
    - SHEN HD ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1995), vol. 25, pages 350 - 356,
    - SHEN HD ET AL., J LAB CLIN MED, (2001), vol. 137, pages 115 - 124,
    - WOODFOLK JA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, pages 29489 - 96,
    - DEUELL, B. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 96 - 101,
    - SHEN, H.D. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1991), vol. 21, pages 675 - 681,
    - HORNER WE ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 107, pages 298 - 300,
    - CHANG CY ET AL., J BIOMED CI, (2002), vol. 9, pages 645 - 655,
    - YASUEDA H. ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1998), vol. 248, pages 240 - 244,
    - ONISHI Y. ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1999), vol. 261, pages 148 - 154,
    - SCHMIDT M. ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1997), vol. 246, pages 181 - 185,
    - RASOOL 0. ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 267, pages 4355 - 4361,
    - KUCHLER, K. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 184, pages 249 - 254,
    - GMACHL, M.; G. KREIL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3569 - 3573,
    - HOFFMAN DR., J ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1977), vol. 59, pages 364 - 366,
    - HABERMANN, E., SCIENCE, (1972), vol. 177, pages 314 - 322,
    - HOFFMAN DR; JACOBSON RS., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 97, pages 812 - 821,
    - HOFFMAN DR; EL-CHOUFANI AE; SMITH MM; DE GROOT H., "Occupational allergy to bumblebee venom: Allergens of Bombus ter-restris", J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2001),
    - HELM R. ET AL., J ALLERG CLIN IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 98, pages 172 - 180,
    - POMES A. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, pages 30801 - 30807,
    - ARRUDA LK ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 19563 - 19568,
    - ARRUDA LK ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 31196 - 31201,
    - ARRUDA LK ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 107, pages 295 - 297,
    - WU CH ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 101, pages 832 - 840,
    - MELEN E. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 103, pages 859 - 64,
    - WU CH ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, pages 17937 - 17943,
    - WU CH ET AL., MOLECULAR IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 34, pages 1 - 8,
    - SANTOS ABR ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 104, pages 329 - 337,
    - ASTURIAS JA ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 162, pages 4342 - 4348,
    - MAZUR, G. ET AL., MONOG. ALLERGY, (1990), vol. 28, pages 121 - 137,
    - MONEO I. ET AL., ALLERGY, (2003), vol. 58, pages 34 - 37,
    - SOLDATOVA, L. ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1993), vol. 320, pages 145 - 149,
    - LU, G. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 93, page 224,
    - FANG, K. S. F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 895 - 899,
    - KING, T. P. ET AL., PROT. SEQ. DATA ANAL., (1990), vol. 3, pages 263 - 266,
    - LU, G. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 2823 - 2830,
    - KING, T. P.; LU, G., UNPUBLISHED DATA, (1997),
    - KING TP ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 98, pages 588 - 600,
    - HOFFMAN, D.R., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 92, pages 707 - 716,
    - HOFFMAN DR., UNPUBLISHED DATA, (1992),
    - HOFFMAN DR., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 91, page 187,
    - JACOBSON RS ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 89, page 292,
    - HOFFMAN DR., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 91, pages 71 - 78,
    - SCHMIDT M. ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1993), vol. 319, pages 138 - 140,
    - PADDOCK CD ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 167, pages 2694 - 2699,
    - ELSAYED S; BENNICH H., SCAND J IMMUNOL, (1974), vol. 3, pages 683 - 686,
    - ELSAYED S. ET AL., IMMUNOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 9, pages 647 - 661,
    - HOFFMAN, D. R., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1983), vol. 71, pages 481 - 486,
    - LANGELAND, T., ALLERGY, (1983), vol. 38, pages 493 - 500,
    - DAUL CB; SLATTERY M; MORGAN JE; LEHRER SB., "Common crustacea allergens: identification of B cell epitopes with the shrimp specific monoclonal antibodies", DAUL CB; SLATTERY M; MORGAN JE; LEHRER SB., D. KRAFT AND A. SEHON, Molecular Biology and Immunology of Allergens, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 291 - 293,
    - SHANTI KN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 5354 - 5363,
    - YU CJ ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 170, pages 445 - 453,
    - MIYAZAWA M ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 98, pages 948 - 953,
    - ASTURIAS JA ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 128, pages 90 - 96,
    - LOPATA AL ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 100, pages 642 - 648,
    - HOFFMANN-SOMMERGRUBER K. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, (1999), vol. 29, pages 840 - 847,
    - MONSALVE RI ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1993), vol. 293, pages 625 - 632,
    - MONSALVE RI ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (1997), vol. 27, pages 833 - 841,
    - MENA, M. ET AL., PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1992), vol. 20, pages 451 - 458,
    - PALOSUO K. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 108, pages 634 - 638,
    - XU H. ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 164, pages 255 - 259,
    - PASTORELLO EA ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., vol. 94, pages 699 - 707,
    - DIAZ-PERALES A. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 790 - 796,
    - GALLEGUILL'OS F; RODRIGUEZ JC., CLIN ALLERGY, (1978), vol. 8, pages 21 - 24,
    - BAUR X., CLIN ALLERGY, (1979), vol. 9, pages 451 - 457,
    - GAILHOFER G. ET AL., CLIN ALLERGY, (1988), vol. 18, pages 445 - 450,
    - MENENDEZ-ARIAS, L. ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 177, pages 159 - 166,
    - GONZALEZ R. ET AL., LANCET, (1995), vol. 346, pages 48 - 49,
    - KLEINE-TEBBE J. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 797 - 804,
    - SANCHEZ-MONGE R. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 106, pages 955 - 961,
    - GAVROVIC-JANKULOVIC M. ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUN OL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 805 - 810,
    - PASTORELLO EA ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. B BIOMED. SCI. APPL., (2001), vol. 756, pages 85 - 93,
    - MONEO I. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 106, pages 177 - 182,
    - ASTURIAS JA ET AL., ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 55, pages 898 - 890,
    - CHRISTIE, J. F. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 69, pages 596 - 602,
    - BAUR X. ET AL., CLIN ALLERGY, (1982), vol. 12, pages 9 - 17,
    - ONISUKA R. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 125, pages 135 - 143,
    - CZUPPON AB ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 92, pages 690 - 697,
    - ATTANAYAKA DPSTG ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1991), vol. 16, pages 1079 - 1081,
    - CHYE ML; CHEUNG KY., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1995), vol. 26, pages 397 - 402,
    - ALENIUS H. ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 102, pages 61 - 66,
    - YEANG HY; CHEONG KF; SUNDERASAN E; HAMZAH S; CHEW NP; HAMID S; HAMILTON RG; CARDOSA MJ., "The 14.6 kD (REF, Hev b 1) and 24 kD (Hev b 3) rubber particle proteins are recognised by IgE from Spina Bifida patients with Latex allergy", J ALLERG CLIN IMMUNOL, (1996),
    - SUNDERASAN E. ET AL., J NAT RUBB RES, (1995), vol. 10, pages 82 - 99,
    - SWOBODA I. ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 4576 - 84,
    - ZHEN L. ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2003), vol. 71, pages 3920 - 3926,
    - KOHLER, G.; MILSTEIN, C., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495,
    - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 1202,
    - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214,
    - GILLIES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 125, pages 191 - 202,
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323,
    - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4/5, pages 489 - 498,
    - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814,
    - ROGUSKA ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 913,
    - GUPTA R. K. ET AL., VACCINE, (1993), vol. 11, pages 293 - 306,
    - JOHNSON A. G., CLIN. MICROBIOL. REV., vol. 7, pages 277 - 289,
    - SCHRAMM G ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 162, pages 2406 - 1435,
    - FLICKER S ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 165, pages 3849 - 3859,
    - MAGLIO 0 ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (2002), vol. 15, pages 635 - 642,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning, 2nd ed, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989),
    - AUSUBEL ET AL., Short Protocols in Molecular Biology, 3rd ed., WILEY AND SONS, (1995),
    - PUROHIT ET AL., CLIN.EXP.ALLERGY, (2005), vol. 35, pages 186 - 192,
    - M. FOCKE ET AL., FASEB J, (2001), vol. 15, pages 2042 - 4,
    - FOCKE ET AL., FASEB J, (2001), vol. 15, page 2042,
    - HAUSWIRTH ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 110, page 102,
    - VRTALA ET AL., J OF IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 151, pages 4773 - 4781,
    - VRTALA ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 102, pages 160 - 9,
    - HAUSWIRTH ET AL., J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 110, pages 102 - 109,
    - FOCKE M ET AL., CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2004), vol. 34, pages 1525 - 1533,
 AT20060000733