EP2975204 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A GATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sommer Antriebs- und Funktechnik GmbH Hans-Böckler-Strasse 21-27 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walddörfer, Dieter In den Sandäckern 3 73252 Lenningen / DE | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | ||
Former [2016/03] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei RUCKH Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | Application number, filing date | 15163618.0 | 15.04.2015 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | DE201420103264U | 16.07.2014 Original published format: DE 202014103264 U | [2016/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975204 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975204 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/668 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
E05F15/668 (EP);
E05Y2400/30 (EP);
E05Y2400/456 (EP);
E05Y2900/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2020/39] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2016/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EIN TOR | [2016/03] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A GATE | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UNE PORTE | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 06.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4339565 (HOERMANN KG VERKAUFSGES [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 *[I] 7,11-15; | [XYI]DE102006006270 (MARANTEC ANTRIEB STEUERUNG [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] , [0010] , [0013] , [0017] * [Y] 2-5 [I] 10; | [Y]US2013321127 (WILDER STEVEN E [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * |