EP3000616 - RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRE AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Daisuke c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 15178018.6 | 23.07.2015 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | JP20140195250 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014195250 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000616 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3000616 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08K3/36, C08L9/06 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
C08L9/06 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L9/06 (EP,US);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/548 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR REIFEN UND REIFEN | [2016/13] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRE AND TIRE | [2016/13] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR PNEU ET PNEU | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2015 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | IE | 23.07.2018 | LU | 23.07.2018 | MT | 23.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
MT | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
MT | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
MT | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
MT | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 23.07.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2154006 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2599645 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2662405 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]EP2674454 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-8 * example 1; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2014011944 (KONDO TOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2006056919 | JP2007197671 | JP2008101158 | JP2011089081 |