|
25.11.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.11.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.06.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
12.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.02.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |