EP3142125 - CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lapp Engineering AG Hinterbergstrasse 15 6330 Cham / CH | [2021/18] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states Lapp Engineering & Co. Hinterbergstraße 15 6330 Cham / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖRNER, Werner Gartenstraße 1B 14169 Berlin / DE | 02 /
PFEFFER, Harry Ochsenweg 21 71159 Mötzingen / DE | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Rutz & Partner Alpenstrasse 14 Postfach 7627 6304 Zug / CH | [2021/18] |
Former [2017/11] | Rutz & Partner Alpenstrasse 14 Postfach 4627 6304 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 15184559.1 | 09.09.2015 | [2017/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3142125 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3142125 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/282 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
H01B7/2825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2017/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KABEL | [2017/11] | English: | CABLE | [2017/11] | French: | CABLE | [2017/11] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2015 | AL | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | IE | 09.09.2021 | LU | 09.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 09.09.2015 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 09.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 09.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1398799 (NEXANS [FR]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0021]; figure 1 * [I] 2,9-15; | [Y]DE102012212205 (TYCO ELECTRONICS RAYCHEM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-14 *; | [Y]EP2669901 (NEXANS [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-14 *; | [Y]EP0809261 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-11 * | Examination | EP2656357 | US2013220666 | EP1188166 | by applicant | DE10131569 |