EP3001412 - SOUND REPRODUCTION SYSTEM WITH AUDIO HEADPHONES PROVIDED WITH SOUND PROCESSORS, COMPONENTS OF SUCH A SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot Drones 174-178 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2016/30] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Parrot 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIEU, Jérôme 14 boulevard Edgar Quinet 75014 PARIS / FR | 02 /
LHUILLERY, Frédéric c/o PARROT 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 PARIS / FR | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15186085.5 | 21.09.2015 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | FR20140059185 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: FR 1459185 | [2016/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001412 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10K15/02 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
H04R1/1041 (EP,US);
H04S3/004 (CN);
G06F3/165 (US);
G10K15/02 (EP,US);
H04R1/10 (CN);
H04R27/00 (EP,US);
H04S7/30 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (CN);
H04R2420/07 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2016/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONWIEDERGABESYSTEM MIT AUDIO-HEADSETS, DIE MIT KLANGPROZESSOREN AUSGESTATTET SIND, KOMPONENTEN EINES SOLCHEN SYSTEMS UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2016/13] | English: | SOUND REPRODUCTION SYSTEM WITH AUDIO HEADPHONES PROVIDED WITH SOUND PROCESSORS, COMPONENTS OF SUCH A SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2016/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RESTITUTION SONORE AVEC CASQUES AUDIO DOTÉS DE PROCESSEURS SONORES, COMPOSANTS D'UN TEL SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014073429 (MENESES ANTONIO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0017] , [0018] , [0038] , [0039] , [0045] , [0046] , [0049] , [0048] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] , [0052] , [0054] - [0056] - [0059] , [0063] , [0065] , [0066] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0072] - [0084] , [0086] , [0088] , [0135] , [0139] * [Y] 4,7; | [Y]US2012197650 (RESCH BARBARA [SE], et al) [Y] 4,7 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0106] , [0107] , [0108] *; | [X]US8767996 (LIN ROCKY CHAU-HSIUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, lines 29-35,39-67 * * column 3, lines 15-28,34-36 * * column 4, lines 10-15 * * column 6, lines 40-46,56-58 * * column 7, line 54 - column 9, line 21 *; | [A]WO2009093867 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008125044 (KIM JU YUN [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009271015 (OH HYEN O [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Standards and Practices for Authoring Dolby Digital and Dolby E Bitstreams", (20020101), URL: http://www.dolby.com/in/en/technologies/standards-and-practices-for-authoring-dolby-digital-and-dolby-e-bitstreams.pdf, (20160219), XP055251594 [A] 1-10 * Section 2.3 Metadata * | by applicant | US2014073429 |