EP3005885 - EXTENSIONAL VISCOSITY TO PROMOTE SAFE SWALLOWING OF FOOD BOLUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBIDGE, Adam Ch. des Granges 13 1273 Arzier / CH | 02 /
ENGMANN, Jan Ch. du Devin 101 1012 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
POPA NITA, Simina Florentina Avenue de Marcelin 7 1110 Morges / CH | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Chautard, Cécile Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Chautard, Cécile Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 15186386.7 | 01.03.2012 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | US201161447745P | 01.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161447745 P | US201161469852P | 31.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161469852 P | US201161570879P | 15.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161570879 P | EP20110193803 | 15.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11193803 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005885 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/206, A23L29/238, A23L29/25, A23L33/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A23L29/206 (EP,BR,CN,US);
A61K31/07 (BR,US);
A23L29/238 (EP,BR,CN,US);
A23L29/25 (EP,BR,CN,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,BR,CN,US);
A61K31/122 (BR,US);
A61K31/375 (BR,US);
A61K31/7048 (BR,US);
A61K33/00 (BR,US);
A61K35/741 (US);
A61K35/744 (US);
A61K35/747 (US);
A61K36/815 (US);
A61K47/36 (BR,US);
A61K47/46 (BR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DEHNVISKOSITÄT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES SICHEREN SCHLUCKENS VON NAHRUNGSKUGELN | [2016/15] | English: | EXTENSIONAL VISCOSITY TO PROMOTE SAFE SWALLOWING OF FOOD BOLUSES | [2016/15] | French: | VISCOSITÉ D'EXTENSION PERMETTANT DE FAVORISER L'AVALEMENT DE BOLUS DE NOURRITURE EN TOUTE SÉCURITÉ | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 27.10.2016 | Observations by third parties | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12707286.6 / EP2680711 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0060953 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03011051 (PHAGIA GEL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003091613 (DEWILLE NORMANELLA T [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [X]US7008654 (FUCHS EILEEN C [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * claim 5 *; | [XI]WO2006054886 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0014]; claims 1, 9, 11 * [I] 1-8,11-21; | [A]WO2007097315 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2010122332 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM [GB], et al) [X] 9,10 * claims 1, 5, 20, 24, 26-28 * | by applicant | WO2011056487 | US2011217442 | - CHAN ET AL., FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (2007), vol. 21, pages 716 - 725 | - JAMES MONROE JAY ET AL., Modern food microbiology, 7th ed., SPRINGER SCIENCE, (2005), page 790 | - GLENN R. GIBSON; MARCEL B. ROBERFROID, "Dietary Modulation of the Human Colonic Microbiota: Introducing the Concept of Prebiotics", J. NUTR., (1995), vol. 125, pages 1401 - 1412, XP002153893 | - SALMINEN S; OUWEHAND A.; BENNO Y ET AL., "Probiotics: how should they be defined?", TRENDS FOOD SCI. TECHNOL., (1999), vol. 10, pages 107 - 10, XP055150446 |