EP3006112 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR REFINING SAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDE Global Limited Ballyreagh Industrial Estate Sandholes Road Cookstown County Tyrone BT80 9DG / GB | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sloan, Glenn 24 Glebe Road Castlerock, County Londonderry BT51 4SW / GB | 02 /
Convery, Anthony 12 Springhill Road Moneymore, County Londonderry BT45 7NG / GB | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Waller, Stephen FRKelly 4 Mount Charles Belfast, Northern Ireland BT7 1NZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15188405.3 | 05.10.2015 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | GB20140017830 | 08.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201417830 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006112 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006112 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
B03B9/00 (EP,GB,US);
B03B9/02 (US);
B03B5/00 (GB);
B03B5/34 (US);
B03B5/48 (US);
B03B7/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON SAND | [2016/15] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR REFINING SAND | [2016/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE RAFFINAGE DU SABLE | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2015 | AL | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | LU | 05.10.2017 | MT | 05.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.10.2015 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.10.2015 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 05.10.2015 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.10.2015 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.10.2015 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 26.04.2017 | |
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 26.04.2017 | |
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004026342 (O'BRIEN SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1,7* figure 1; claim - *; | [A]WO2010088090 (UNIMIN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014106302 (PREC SAND LTD [CA]) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * |