EP3015098 - EQUIPMENT, DRESSING AND GARMENT WIRELESS CONNECTIVIITY TO A PATIENT BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBBLE, David Lance 525 East New York Street Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | 02 /
NEWKIRK, David C. 1274 Skyview Circle Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US | 03 /
HOOD, Michael Scott 51 Pine Grove Drive Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 04 /
LINGENFELSER, Joshua Peter 1605 Eagon Court Fuquay Varina, NC 27526 / US | 05 /
ZERHUSEN, Robert Mark 10186 Owl Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US | 06 /
DIXON, Steven Alan 12818 Raysbrook Drive Riverview, FL 33569 / US | 07 /
WILDMAN, Timothy D. 7034 State Route 229 North Metamora, IN 47030 / US | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15190831.6 | 21.10.2015 | [2016/18] | Priority number, date | US201462073098P | 31.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462073098 P | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3015098 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3015098 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, A61G7/057, A61B5/11 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/1115 (EP,US);
G08B21/0461 (US);
A61B5/1117 (EP,US);
A61G7/0507 (EP,US);
A61G7/05776 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP);
A61B5/0024 (EP,US);
A61B5/6807 (EP,US);
A61G2205/20 (EP,US);
A61G2205/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KONNEKTIVITÄT VON AUSRÜSTUNG, VERBAND UND KLEIDUNG AN EIN PATIENTENBETT | [2016/18] | English: | EQUIPMENT, DRESSING AND GARMENT WIRELESS CONNECTIVIITY TO A PATIENT BED | [2016/18] | French: | CONNEXION SANS FIL D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT, D'UN PANSEMENT ET D'UN VÊTEMENT À UN LIT DE PATIENT | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/17] | 13.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6208250 (DIXON STEPHEN A [US], et al) [YD] 4-9 * column 16, lines 24-36; figure 6 *; | [XY]US2007159332 (KOBLASZ ARTHUR [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] - [0080]; figure 3 * [Y] 4-9; | [I]US2009044334 (PARSELL DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0091]; figures 4c-d, 5a-e *; | [A]EP2767918 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 4-9* paragraph [0036] * | by applicant | US5010772 | US5253656 | US6208250 | US6438776 | US6585328 | US6924441 | US7253366 | US7319386 | US7409735 | US2010274331 | US2010325796 | US2011024076 | US8272276 | US2013298330 | US2014059766 | US2014196210 |