EP3158894 - WEARABLE SITTING POSTURE ASSISTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/17] | CONTROL UNIT FOR WEARABLE SITTING POSTURE ASSISTING DEVICE | ||
[2019/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states noonee AG Zollikerstrasse 1 8008 Zürich / CH | [2019/01] |
Former [2017/17] | For all designated states noonee AG Joweid Zentrum 1 8630 Rüti ZH / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNURA, Keith Kalkbreitestrasse 59 8003 Zurich / CH | 02 /
MOTOVILOVA, Olga Uetliberghalde 1 8045 Zurich / CH | 03 /
VAFI, Daniel Englischviertelstrasse 10 8032 Zurich / CH | [2017/30] |
Former [2017/17] | 01 /
GUNURA, Keith Funkackerstrasse 16 8050 Zurich / CH | ||
02 /
MOTOVILOVA, Olga Uetliberghalde 1 8045 Zurich / CH | |||
03 /
VAFI, Daniel Englischviertelstrasse 10 8032 Zurich / CH | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15190897.7 | 21.10.2015 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158894 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, A61F5/058, B25J9/00, A47C9/02 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B25J9/0006 (EP,KR,US);
A47C9/025 (EP,KR,US);
A47C31/00 (KR);
A47C7/62 (KR);
A61F5/0125 (EP,KR,US);
A61F5/0585 (EP,US);
A61H3/00 (KR);
A61F2005/0158 (EP,KR,US);
A61H2003/007 (US);
A61H2201/1633 (KR);
A61H2201/1642 (KR);
A61H2201/165 (KR);
A61H2201/1652 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/17] | A47C9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2017/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE SITZHALTUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/47] | English: | WEARABLE SITTING POSTURE ASSISTING DEVICE | [2019/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE DE POSTURE ASSISE PORTABLE | [2019/47] |
Former [2017/17] | STEUERUNGSEINHEIT FÜR TRAGBARE SITZHALTUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/17] | CONTROL UNIT FOR WEARABLE SITTING POSTURE ASSISTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2017/17] | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE DE POSTURE ASSISE PORTABLE | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 26.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009099494 (ASHIHARA JUN [JP]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-9 * [I] 11; | [X]US2009292232 (ASHIHARA JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12-14 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]JP2014195509 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0052]; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | WO2015028373 |