EP3040744 - X-RAY BEAM INTENSITY MONITORING DEVICE AND X-RAY INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | For all designated states Tsinghua University Qinghua Yuan Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2020/27] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Fl. Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Hadian District Beijing 100084 / CN | ||
For all designated states Tsinghua University Qinghua Yuan Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yuanjing Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 02 /
KANG, Kejun Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 03 /
LI, Shuwei Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Qingjun Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 05 /
LI, Yulan Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 06 /
ZHAO, Ziran Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Yinong Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 08 /
LIU, Yaohong Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 09 /
ZHU, Weibin Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 10 /
ZHAO, Xiaolin Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | 11 /
HE, Huishao Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2020/06] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
LI, Yuanjing 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu Haidan District Beijing 100084 / CN | ||
02 /
KANG, Kejun 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Shuwei 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Qingjun 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Yulan 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
06 /
ZHAO, Ziran 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
07 /
LIU, Yinong 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
08 /
LIU, Yaohong 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
09 /
ZHU, Weibin 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
10 /
ZHAO, Xiaolin 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
11 /
HE, Huishao 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
Former [2016/27] | 01 /
LI, Yuanjing 2nd Floor, Block A, Tongfang Building Shuangquinglu, Haidan District 100084 Beijing / CN | ||
02 /
KANG, Kejun 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Shuwei 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Qingjun 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Yulan 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
06 /
ZHAO, Ziran 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
07 /
LIU, Yinong 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
08 /
LIU, Yaohong 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
09 /
ZHU, Weibin 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
10 /
ZHAO, Xiaolin 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
11 /
HE, Huishao 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | Representative(s) | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2020/27] |
Former [2016/27] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15203078.9 | 30.12.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | CN201410851366 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410851366 | CN201410851416 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410851416 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040744 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3040744 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V5/00, G01T1/17 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G01T1/17 (EP,BR,RU,US);
G01T1/2006 (BR,US);
G01T7/00 (BR,US);
G01T1/1603 (US);
G01V5/22 (EP,BR,US);
H04N5/57 (US);
H05G1/36 (US);
H10K39/00 (US);
G01T1/1606 (BR);
G06T1/0014 (US);
G09G2320/0626 (US);
G09G2320/0646 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER RÖNTGENSTRAHLINTENSITÄT UND RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNTERSUCHUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/27] | English: | X-RAY BEAM INTENSITY MONITORING DEVICE AND X-RAY INSPECTION SYSTEM | [2016/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'INTENSITÉ D'UN FAISCEAU DE RAYONS X ET SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION PAR RAYONS X | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.01.2020 | 08.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2015 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | IE | 30.12.2020 | LU | 30.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 30.12.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.12.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US4051377 (KEMNER RUDOLF, et al) [X] 1,7-9,11 * column 2, line 19 - line 64 * * column 3, line 10 - line 12 * * column 3, line 46 - line 50 * * column 1, line 4 - line 8; figure - * [A] 5 [Y] 4 [I] 2,3,6,10,12,13; | [YA]US7091486 (MCCORD MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 31 - line 37; figure - *[A] 5 | Examination | - Anonymous, "adopt, v. : Oxford English Dictionary", (20190705), URL: https://www.oed.com/view/Entry/2665?redirectedFrom=adopt#eid, (20190705), XP055602693 |