EP3097139 - IMPREGNATION PROCESS FOR A FUNCTIONAL FIBROUS SUBSTRATE, A LIQUID MONOMER SYRUP FOR THE IMPREGNATION PROCESS, ITS METHOD OF POLYMERIZATION AND STRUCTURED ARTICLE OBTAINED THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERARD, Pierre 8 Rue des Magnolias F-64230 Denguin / FR | 02 /
GLOTIN, Michel Bâtiment A1- Résidence Beausoleil 160 Boulevard de la République F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | 03 /
TAILLEMITE, Sébastien 13bis Rue du Pavé des Gardes F-92370 Chaville / FR | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 15700888.9 | 22.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015EP51282 | Priority number, date | FR20140050543 | 22.01.2014 Original published format: FR 1450543 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015110549 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097139 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3097139 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08J5/06, C08J5/24 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
C08J5/042 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (US);
B05D3/007 (US);
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
B05D2256/00 (US);
B05D2502/00 (US);
C08J2333/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPREGNIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN FUNKTIONELLES FASERSUBSTRAT, EIN FLÜSSIGES MONOMERSIRUP FÜR DAS IMPREGNIERUNGSVERFAHREN, SEINE POLYMERISATIONSMETHODE UND DER DADURCH ERHALTENE STRUKTURGEGENSTAND | [2019/31] | English: | IMPREGNATION PROCESS FOR A FUNCTIONAL FIBROUS SUBSTRATE, A LIQUID MONOMER SYRUP FOR THE IMPREGNATION PROCESS, ITS METHOD OF POLYMERIZATION AND STRUCTURED ARTICLE OBTAINED THEREOF | [2016/48] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPREGNATION POUR UN SUBSTRAT FIBREUX FONCTIONNEL, SIROP MONOMERE LIQUIDE POUR LE PROCEDE D'IMPREGNATION, SA METHODE DE POLYMERISATION ET ARTICLE STRUCTUREL OBTENU AINSI | [2019/31] |
Former [2016/48] | IMPRÄGNIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN FUNKTIONALES FASERSUBSTRAT, FLÜSSIGMONOMERSIRUP FÜR DAS IMPRÄGNIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE STRUKTURIERTE ARTIKEL | ||
Former [2016/48] | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRÉGNATION DE SUBSTRAT FIBREUX FONCTIONNEL, SIROP MONOMÈRE LIQUIDE POUR LE PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRÉGNATION, SON PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION ET ARTICLE STRUCTURÉ OBTENU À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 31.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2015 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 22.01.2015 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE1284083 (DEGUSSA) [X] 1-12,14-16,18-21,23,27-29 * column 1, line 33 - line 61; example 1 * * column 3, line 11 - line 37 * [Y] 1-29; | [Y]FR2981652 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1-29 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 23 * * page 9, line 22 - page 11, line 38 * * page 12, line 27 - page 14, line 38 * * page 15, line 30 - page 17, line 23; examples 1,2 *; | [Y] - Y. THOMAS ET AL, "Improvement of fibre/matrix bonding in carbon-fibre/acrylic composites by electron-irradiation: Concept of difunctional chemical coupling agent", COMPOSITES SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19940101), vol. 52, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0266-3538(94)90165-1, ISSN 0266-3538, pages 299 - 307, XP055150963 [Y] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0266-3538(94)90165-1 | [Y] - A. KAUL ET AL, "Effect of bulk structure of amino silane primer on the strength and durability of aluminum/epoxy joints", POLYMER ENGINEERING & SCIENCE, (19860601), vol. 26, no. 11, doi:10.1002/pen.760261108, ISSN 0032-3888, pages 768 - 775, XP055151333 [Y] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pen.760261108 | [A] - /, "Hexcel Selector Guide Industry", (20130429), URL: http://www.hexcel.com/Resources/SelectorGuides/Industrial_SelectorGuide.pdf, (20141106), XP055151460 [A] 1-29 * page 11 * |