|
20.12.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2023 |
Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.06.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.06.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2020 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |