EP3169604 - FLEXIBLE CONTAINER WITH FITMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREIRA, Bruno R. Alameda Garoupa 110 06540-385 Santana De Parnaiba / BR | 02 /
FRANCA, Marcos P. R Camilo Nader 315 Apt 52 05688-032 Sao Paulo / BR | 03 /
WILKES, Kenneth R. 98 Fairway Road Asheville, NC 28804 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15745040.4 | 15.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015US40568 | Priority number, date | US201462025288P | 16.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462025288 P | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016011153 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169604 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65B3/04, B65B3/02, B65B61/18, B65B61/00, B65B43/08, B65D75/56 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B31B70/844 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B31B70/85 (KR);
B65B61/188 (EP,CN,US);
B65B3/027 (CN,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/5344 (EP,US);
B29C66/63 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81423 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/83221 (EP,US);
B31B70/74 (US);
B31B70/872 (EP,KR,US);
B31B70/874 (EP,KR,US);
B65B3/02 (CN,KR,US);
B65B3/045 (EP,CN,US);
B65B43/08 (CN,KR,US);
B65B61/005 (CN,US);
B65B61/186 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65B7/02 (CN,US);
B65D75/563 (EP,CN,US);
B65D75/5805 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65D75/5811 (EP,CN,US);
B65D75/5861 (KR);
B65D75/5866 (EP,CN,US);
B65D75/5883 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/74 (US);
B29C65/749 (US);
B29C66/53242 (US);
B29C66/53246 (US);
B29C66/53262 (US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7128 (EP,US);
B31B2150/00 (EP,KR,US);
B31B2160/20 (EP,US);
B31B2170/20 (EP,US);
B31B70/642 (EP,US);
B31B70/66 (EP,US);
B65D2575/586 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0633 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER BEHÄLTER MIT EINSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/21] | English: | FLEXIBLE CONTAINER WITH FITMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2017/21] | French: | RÉCIPIENT SOUPLE AVEC ACCESSOIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 06.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5378065 (TOBOLKA STEFAN [CA]) [Y] 14 * figure 9 * [A] 12,13,15; | [XAYI]EP0893358 (HOSOKAWA YOKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 12,13 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,3,10 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 42 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 22 * [A] 1-11 [Y] 14 [I] 15; | [A]US5952066 (SCHMIDT STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 5, line 43 - line 45 *; | [YA]US2003202719 (WILKES KENNETH R [US]) [Y] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0034] - [0065]; figures 1-11 * [A] 7-10,12-15; | [YA]DE10323600 (HERRMANN ULTRASCHALLTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [0023] - [0028]; figures 1-4 * [A] 7-10,12-15; | [A]GB2406847 (MOLYTEC LTDA [CO]) [A] 4 * page 9 *; | [A]US2007110344 (MURRAY R C [US]) [A] 12-15 * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2011056965 (PEER SYED M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011069908 (WILKES KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | Examination | EP1679264 | by applicant | US5783638 |