EP3183523 - A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HIGH SHEAR LIQUID METAL TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cassinath, Zen 17 Woodyard Close Castle Gresley DE11 9HR / GB | [2020/41] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Cassinath, Zen Wood Cottage Wood Street Ashyby de la Zouch, Leicestershire LE65 1EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15762664.9 | 19.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015GB52409 | Priority number, date | GB20140014810 | 20.08.2014 Original published format: GB 201414810 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016027087 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183523 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183523 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F27D27/00, B01F13/08, B22D17/30, C22B9/00, B01F7/18, B22D1/00, B01F15/00 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B22D1/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F27D27/00 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
B22D1/002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01F27/902 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01F27/91 (GB);
B01F35/53 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | F27D27/00, B01F13/08, B22D17/30, C22B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLÜSSIGMETALLBEHANDLUNG MIT HOHER SCHERUNG | [2017/26] | English: | A DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HIGH SHEAR LIQUID METAL TREATMENT | [2017/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE MÉTAL LIQUIDE À CISAILLEMENT ÉLEVÉ | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2015 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | IE | 19.08.2020 | LU | 19.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 19.08.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN102861902B (UNIV BEIJING SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12-14,20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *[I] 3,5,8-11,15-19 |