EP3169923 - SYSTEM FOR HOLDING IN A CONDUIT CABLES OR DUCTS WITH DIFFERENT DIAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beele Engineering B.V. Beunkdijk 11 7122 NZ Aalten / NL | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEELE, Johannes Alfred Beunkdijk 11 7122 NZ Aalten / NL | [2018/52] |
Former [2017/21] | 01 /
BEELE, Johannes Alfred Beunkdijk 11 NL-7122 NZ Aalten / NL | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 15762977.5 | 10.09.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015EP70721 | Priority number, date | NL20141040892 | 16.07.2014 Original published format: NL 1040892 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016009092 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3169923 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169923 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/04, F16L5/14, H02G3/22 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
F16L5/14 (EP,US);
F16L7/00 (KR);
F16L3/223 (KR);
F16L3/2235 (US);
F16L3/23 (KR);
F16L3/26 (US);
F16L5/04 (EP,US);
F16L5/10 (US);
H02G3/0412 (US);
H02G3/0456 (US);
H02G3/0481 (US);
H02G3/0487 (US);
H02G3/22 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM HALTEN VON KABELN ODER KANÄLEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN DURCHMESSERN IN EINER LEITUNG | [2018/29] | English: | SYSTEM FOR HOLDING IN A CONDUIT CABLES OR DUCTS WITH DIFFERENT DIAMETERS | [2017/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT DE CÂBLES OU CANALISATIONS DE DIAMÈTRES DIFFÉRENTS DANS UN CONDUIT | [2017/21] |
Former [2017/21] | SYSTEM ZUM HALTEN VON KABELN ODER SCHLÄUCHEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN DURCHMESSERN IN EINER LEITUNG | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2015 | AL | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | IE | 10.09.2019 | LU | 10.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.09.2015 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.09.2015 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE9305975U (REIKU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-13,15,21-41,44,45,49-52,54-61,63,67-72 * figure - * * page 7, paragraph l * * page 8, paragraph l - page 9, paragraph 1 * [I] 7-9,17-20,42,43,46-48,53,62,64-66; | [AD]WO03013658 (BEELE ENG BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-72 * abstract * * page 7, lines 10-17; figure 3 *; | [XI]DE10227098 (SCHULTE GUENTER [DE]) [X] 54-61,63,67-71 * abstract * * paragraph [0029]; figure 6 *[I] 62,64-66; | [XI]DE102005011286 (HAUFF TECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-13,15,21-41,44,45,49-52,54-61,63,67-72 * abstract * * paragraph [0032]; figure 6 * [I] 7-9,17-20,42,43,46-48,53,62,64-66; | [XI]DE102005002879 (SCHMID GABRIELE [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-13,15,16,21-27,29-41,44,45,49-52,54-61,63,67-72 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * [I] 7-9,14,17-20,28,42,43,46-48,53,62,64-66; | [XI]FR2888512 (VIGNE FREDERIC RAOUL MARC [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-13,15,21-41,44,45,49-52,54-61,63,67-72 * abstract * * page 4, lines 23-27 * [I] 7-9,17-20,42,43,46-48,53,62,64-66; | [AD]WO2008104237 (BEELE ENG BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-72 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2010090582 (ROXTEC AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-13,15,21-41,44,45,49-52,54-61,63,67-72 * abstract * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 21 * [I] 7-9,17-20,42,43,46-48,53,62,64-66; | [XI]US2012018960 (ANDERSSON JENS [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,10-13,15,21-41,44,45,49-52,54-61,63,67-72 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * [I] 7-9,17-20,42,43,46-48,53,62,64-66 | by applicant | WO03013658 | WO2008104237 |