Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191482

EP3191482 - 1,2,3-THIADIAZOL-5YL-UREA DERIVATIVES, USE THEREOF FOR REGULATING PLANT SENESCENCE AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ustav experimentalni botaniky AV CR, v.v.i.
Rozvojova 263
165 02 Praha 6 - Lysolaje / CZ
[2019/08]
Former [2017/39]For all designated states
Ustav Experimentalni Botaniky Av CR, V.V.I.
Rozvojova 263
Lysolaje
165 02 Praha 6 / CZ
For all designated states
Palacky University Olomouc
Krízkovského 511/8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Ustav Experimentalni Botaniky Av CR, V.V.I.
Rozvojova 263
Lysolaje
165 02 Praha 6 / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / NISLER, Jaroslav
V Rovinách 40
140 00 Praha 4 / CZ
02 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18A
787 01 Sumperk / CZ
03 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
04 / KOPRNA, Radoslav
Sokolovska 161/2B
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
05 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
783 65 Hlubocky / CZ
06 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina , et al
HARBER IP s.r.o.
Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52
170 00 Praha 7 / CZ
[2019/13]
Former [2017/29]Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Application number, filing date15763189.602.09.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015CZ50003
Priority number, dateCZ20140000613U09.09.2014         Original published format: CZ 201400613 U
CZ20150000230U02.04.2015         Original published format: CZ 201500230 U
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016037595
Date:17.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3191482
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016
[2017/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3191482
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07D417/12, A01N43/72, C07D285/06
[2017/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:1,2,3-THIADIAZOL-5YL-HARNSTOFFDERIVATE, VERWENDUNG DAVON ZUR REGULIERUNG VON PFLANZENSENESZENZ UND ZUBEREITUNGEN MIT DIESEN DERIVATEN[2017/29]
English:1,2,3-THIADIAZOL-5YL-UREA DERIVATIVES, USE THEREOF FOR REGULATING PLANT SENESCENCE AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES[2017/29]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE 1,2,3-THIADIAZOL-5YL-URÉE, UTILISATION DESDITS DÉRIVÉS POUR LA RÉGULATION DE LA SÉNESCENCE DES PLANTES ET PRÉPARATIONS LES CONTENANT[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2017National basic fee paid 
09.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
09.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2019Fee for grant paid
13.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0205638  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MOK ET AL, "Cytokinin activity of N-phenyl-N'-1, 2,3-thiadiazol-5-ylurea (thidiazuron)", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (19820101), vol. 21, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 1509 - 1511, XP022403562 [A] 1-8 * page 1510; compounds 1,6 *
by applicantWO9734485
    - KURITA K.; IWAKURA Y., J. ORG. CHEM., (1976), vol. 41, pages 2070 - 71
    - M. AND J.ASH, Encyclopedia of Surfactants, CHEMICAL PUBLISHING CO., vol. 1-3, pages 1980 - 81
    - DE SIGMOND, A.A.J., "The alkali soils in Hungary and their reclamation", SOIL SCIENCE, (1924), vol. 18, pages 379 - 381
    - RICHARDS, L.A., ORIGIN AND NATURE OF SALINE AND ALKALI SOILS, (1954), pages 1 - 6
    - "Diagnosis and Improvement of Saline and Alkali Soils", Agricultural Handbook No:60
    - "Evidence for toxicity effects of salt on membranes", LEOPOLD, A.C.; R.P WILLING, Salinity Tolerance in Plants. Strategies for Crop Improvement, A WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLICATION, (1984), pages 67 - 76
    - WERNER, T. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 10487 - 92
    - ARNDT F; R RUSCH; HV STILFRIED, "A new cotton defoliant", PLANT PHYSIOL, (1976), vol. 57, page S-99
    - SUTTLE JC, "Effect of the defoliant thidiazuron on ethylene production", PLANT PHYSIOL, (1983), vol. 72, page S-121
    - SUTTLE JC, "Effect of the defoliant thidiazuron on ethylene evolution from Mung Bean Hypocotyl Segments", PLANT. PHYSIOL., (1984), vol. 75, pages 902 - 907
    - "Phytohormones and the endogenous regulation ofsenescence and abscission", NOODEN LD; AC LEOPOLD, Phytohormones and Related Compounds: A Comprehensive Treatise, ELSEVIER, (1978), pages 329 - 370
    - FISEROVA H; KULA E; KLEMS M; REINOHL V, "Phytohormones as indicators of the degree of damage in birch (Betula pendula)", BIOLOGIA, (2001), vol. 56, pages 405 - 409