EP3124273 - TAPE PRINTING DEVICE AND TAPE PRINTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKANO, Hideki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
SODEYAMA, Hideo c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15768426.7 | 19.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP01548 | Priority number, date | JP20140060916 | 24.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014060916 | JP20140157992 | 01.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014157992 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015146094 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3124273 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41J15/04 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
B41J15/044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | B41J17/32, B41J3/36, B41J15/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | BANDDRUCKVORRICHTUNG UND BANDDRUCKSYSTEM | [2017/05] | English: | TAPE PRINTING DEVICE AND TAPE PRINTING SYSTEM | [2017/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION DE BANDE ET SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION DE BANDE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2016 | Translation filed | 24.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2011046142 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [YA]JP2002137475 (SEIKO EPSON CORP, et al) [Y] 1-3, 6, 8 * , paragraph [0060]; fig. 10, 12 (Family: none) * [A] 4, 5, 7; | [YA]JPH0462566 (RICOH KK) [Y] 1-3, 6, 8 * , page 3, lower left column to lower right column; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [A] 4, 5, 7; | [YA]JPH11212428 (RICOH KK) [Y] 1-3, 6, 8 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0032]; fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) * [A] 4, 5, 7; | [Y]JP2001233057 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS, et al) [Y] 2, 3, 6 * , paragraphs [0008], [0018], [0031] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS6242869 (RICOH KK) [Y] 3, 6 * , page 2, upper left column to upper right column; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11245482 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |