EP3194336 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas Swan&Co. Ltd. Administration Offices Rotary Way Consett, Durham DH8 7ND / GB | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LADISLAUS, Paul c/o Thomas Swan&Co. Ltd. Rotary Way Consett Durham DH8 7ND / GB | 02 /
PATON, Keith c/o Thomas Swan&Co. Ltd. Rotary Way Consett Durham DH8 7ND / GB | 03 /
MCHALE, Ronan c/o Thomas Swan&Co. Ltd. Rotary Way Consett Durham DH8 7ND / GB | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15777990.1 | 14.09.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015GB52657 | Priority number, date | GB20140016317 | 16.09.2014 Original published format: GB 201416317 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016042305 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194336 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/182, B01D71/02 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
B01D61/14 (EP,GB,US);
B01D61/00 (US);
B01D65/02 (US);
B01D67/00416 (EP);
B01D67/0046 (EP,US);
B01D71/0211 (EP,GB,US);
C01B21/0648 (EP,US);
C01B32/184 (EP,US);
C01B32/19 (GB);
C01B32/196 (EP,GB,US);
C01B35/146 (GB);
B01D2315/14 (EP,US);
B01D2325/0283 (EP,GB,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | ZWEIDIMENSIONALE MATERIALIEN | [2017/30] | English: | TWO-DIMENSIONAL MATERIALS | [2017/30] | French: | MATÉRIAUX BIDIMENSIONNELS | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 28.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN102693843B ; | [XI]CN103864060 ; | [X]US2007284557 (GRUNER GEORGE [US], et al); | [X]WO2011012874 (UNIV DURHAM [GB], et al); | [XI]WO2011016889 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US], et al); | [X]US2014166475 (CHENG YI-CHENG [US], et al); | [XI]US2014248430 (WONG CHING P [US], et al); |