EP3146262 - LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Chia Ming Apt. 307 14 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15786311.9 | 29.04.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015US28163 | Priority number, date | US201461985762P | 29.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461985762 P | US201462061778P | 09.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462061778 P | US201462074206P | 03.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462074206 P | US201462076695P | 07.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462076695 P | US201562105790P | 21.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562105790 P | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015168218 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3146262 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21V14/02, F21V14/06, F21V14/00, F21S41/657, F21V5/00, B60Q1/076, B60Q1/20, F21S41/143, F21S41/675 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0076 (EP,US);
B60Q1/076 (US);
B60Q1/08 (US);
B60Q1/20 (EP,US);
B60Q1/245 (EP,US);
F21S41/13 (EP,US);
F21S41/16 (EP,US);
F21S41/635 (EP,US);
F21S41/657 (EP,US);
F21S41/675 (EP,US);
F21V14/02 (EP,US);
F21V5/008 (EP,US);
H04B10/116 (US);
H04N23/11 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (US);
B60Q2200/38 (US);
B60Q2300/054 (US);
B60Q2300/21 (US);
F21W2102/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | F21V14/02, F21V14/06, F21V14/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | LICHTSTEUERUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2017/13] | English: | LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2017/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE LUMIÈRE | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5915829 (KALZE FRANZ-JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * the whole document * [I] 2,4; | [X]JP2011025279 (DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract *; | [X]US2011280018 (VISSENBERG MICHEL C J M [NL], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]JP2012059575 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XI]US2013265756 (CHRISTOFFERSEN PETER SKYTTE [DK]) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * [I] 6; | [XA]US2013293722 (CHEN CHIA MING [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-15 | International search | [Y]US4843522 (ROSENBERG BURTON A [US]) [Y] 2, 3 * ; figure 2, column 4, lines 3-11 *; | [Y]US4985651 (CHITAYAT ANWAR [US]) [Y] 3, 5 * ; figure 1, column 5, lines 13-26, 62-67 *; | [XY]US2005228366 (KESSLER RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1, 4 * ; abstract, figures 2, 3A, paragraphs [0020], [0025] * [Y] 2, 3, 5-7; | [A]US2009040299 (HARRISON MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-7* , entire document *; | [Y]US2011103063 (JURIK PAVEL [CZ]) [Y] 7 * ; paragraphs [0017], [0018] *; | [Y]US2013208481 (SOOFERIAN DANNY H [US]) [Y] 6 * ; paragraph [0039] * |