EP3139581 - CALL-CENTER TELEPHONE SYSTEM, PRIVACY TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND NONTEMPORARY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM ON WHICH PRIVACY TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION PROGRAM HAS BEEN STORED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Platforms, Ltd. 2-6-1, Kitamitaka Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8511 / JP | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGA, Satomi c/o NEC Platforms Ltd. 2-6-1 Kitamikata Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8511 / JP | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 15786591.6 | 09.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015JP02000 | Priority number, date | JP20140092475 | 28.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014092475 | [2017/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015166633 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139581 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139581 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/51, H04M3/56 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
H04M3/5175 (EP,US);
H04M3/42314 (US);
H04M3/5133 (EP,US);
H04M3/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEFONSYSTEM FÜR CALLCENTER, DATENSCHUTZ-TELEFONKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND NICHTTEMPORÄRES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM MIT DARAUF GESPEICHERTEM TELEFONKOMMUNIKATIONSPROGRAMM | [2017/10] | English: | CALL-CENTER TELEPHONE SYSTEM, PRIVACY TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND NONTEMPORARY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM ON WHICH PRIVACY TELEPHONE COMMUNICATION PROGRAM HAS BEEN STORED | [2017/10] | French: | SYSTÈME TÉLÉPHONIQUE DE CENTRE D'APPEL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION TÉLÉPHONIQUE PRIVÉE, ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TEMPORAIRE SUR LEQUEL UN PROGRAMME DE COMMUNICATION TÉLÉPHONIQUE PRIVÉE A ÉTÉ STOCKÉ | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2016 | Translation filed | 26.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | ES | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | IT | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | NL | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SE | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | IE | 09.04.2020 | LU | 09.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.04.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Alcatel-Lucent, "Alcatel-Lucent OmniTouch Contact Center Standard Edition Supervisor on Reflexes 4035 and e-Reflexes 4037 Sets Phone Guide R10.0", (20060301), URL: http://enterprise.alcatel-lucent.com/assets/documents/otccs10.0_ug_SupervisoronRef_8AL90105USAA_1.pdf, (20170913), XP055406343 [X] 1-5 * paragraph [03.8] * | [X] - Alcatel-Lucent, "Alcatel-Lucent OmniTouch Contact Center Standard Edition Agent on Reflexes 4035 and e-Reflexes 4037 Sets Phone Guide R10.0", (20060301), URL: http://enterprise.alcatel-lucent.com/assets/documents/otccs10.0_ug_AgentonReflexes_8AL90103USAA_1.pdf, (20170913), XP055406347 [X] 1-5 * paragraph [05.2] * | International search | [XYA]WO0033531 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1, 6, 10 * , page 1, line 30 to page 2, line 2; page 4, line 29 to page 6, line 19; fig. 1 to 3 & AU 1433000 A * [Y] 2-4, 7-9 [A] 5; | [Y]JP2001268242 (HITACHI TELECOMM TECH) [Y] 3-4, 8-9 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0016]; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012019416 (NEC CORP) [Y] 2-4, 7-9 * , paragraphs [0041] to [0051]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013145953 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 4, 9* , paragraphs [0037], [0053] to [0059]; fig. 7 (Family: none) * |