EP3217815 - CONTAINER FOR AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Chris 174 Ivy Exchange Granby Place Parnell Square Dublin 1 / IE | 02 /
MAGUIRE, Kevin 174 Ivy Exchange Granby Place Parnell Square Dublin 1 / IE | 03 /
CARROLL, James 174 Ivy Exchange Granby Place Parnell Square Dublin 1 / IE | 04 /
ROGAN, Andrew 3a Pilmuir Road West Forres Moray / GB | 05 /
ADAIR, Kyle 16 Ayrshire Lane Lisburn Northern Ireland BT28 2UW / IE | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 15790565.4 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015EP75843 | Priority number, date | EP20140193307 | 14.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14193307 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016075028 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3217815 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3217815 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/18 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A24F15/01 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F40/10 (KR);
A24F40/40 (US);
A24F40/95 (EP,CN,US);
A24F9/16 (EP,US);
B65D25/04 (KR,US);
B65D25/20 (KR,US);
B65D43/16 (US);
B65D85/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | A24F15/18, A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR EINE AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/38] | English: | CONTAINER FOR AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE | [2017/38] | French: | CONTENEUR POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2019/27] |
Former [2017/38] | RÉCIPIENT POUR DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2015 | AL | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 01.01.2020 | |
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009283103 (NIELSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] - [0030] - [0044]; figures 1A-F, 4A * [I] 10; | [X]US2010313901 (FERNANDO FELIX [GB], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract *; | [X]US2014053858 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [X] 1,12* abstract *; | [X]US2014107815 (LAMOTHE ANDRE JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,5,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0017] , [0018] , [0030] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040] , [0041] , [0048] - [0052]; figures 1A,1B,2,3,4,6 * |