EP3218392 - MACROCYCLIC PEPTIDES USEFUL AS IMMUNOMODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLMAN, Kevin W. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
GOODRICH, Jason c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 03 /
BOY, Kenneth M. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Yunhui c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 05 /
MAPELLI, Claudio 465 Briggs Road Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | 06 /
POSS, Michael A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 07 /
SUN, Li-Qiang c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 08 /
ZHAO, Qian 93 Hintz Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 09 /
MULL, Eric c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 10 /
GILLIS, Eric P. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 11 /
SCOLA, Paul Michael c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 12 /
LANGLEY, David, R. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 13 /
MEANWELL, M. Nicholas c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Kling, Edouard Swords Laboratories, Ireland Swiss Branch, Steinhausen Hinterbergstrasse 16 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2020/31] |
Former [2017/38] | Kling, Edouard Swords Laboratories, Ireland Swiss Branch, Steinhausen Hinterbergstrasse 16 6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 15801052.0 | 12.11.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015US60265 | Priority number, date | US201462079944P | 14.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462079944 P | US201562111388P | 03.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562111388 P | US201562204689P | 13.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562204689 P | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016077518 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3218392 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3218392 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K7/56, G01N33/68, A61K38/12, A61P37/06 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D201/00 (IL);
C07K7/56 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,IL,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | 13.04.2017 | ME | 13.04.2017 | Validation states | MA | 13.04.2017 | MD | 13.04.2017 | Title | German: | ALS IMMUNMODULATOREN GEEIGNETE MAKROCYCLISCHE PEPTIDE | [2020/09] | English: | MACROCYCLIC PEPTIDES USEFUL AS IMMUNOMODULATORS | [2017/38] | French: | PEPTIDES MACROCYCLIQUES UTILES COMME IMMUNOMODULATEURS | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/38] | ALS IMMUNMODULATOREN NÜTZLICHE, MAKROCYCLISCHE PEPTIDE | ||
Former [2017/38] | PEPTIDES MACROCYCLIQUES UTILES COMME IMMUNOMOLDULATEURS | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20182343.2 / EP3778622 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014151634 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 1-37 * page 1, line 4 - page 14, line 7 * * page 62, line 27 - page 85, line 11 ** claim - * | by applicant | US4439196 | US4447233 | US4447224 | US4475196 | US4486194 | US4487603 | US4522811 | US4596556 | US4790824 | US4941880 | US5064413 | US5312335 | US5374548 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US5399331 | US5416016 | US5811097 | US5837243 | US5922845 | WO2007005874 | US7488802 | US8008449 | US8168757 | - OKAZAKI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 14, pages 779 - 782 | - BENNETT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, pages 711 - 718 | - AGATA ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 8, pages 765 - 772 | - THOMAS, M.L., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 181, pages 1953 - 1956 | - VIVIER, E. ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1997), vol. 18, pages 286 - 291 | - FREEMAN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 192, pages 1027 - 1034 | - LATCHMAN ET AL., NAT. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, pages 261 - 268 | - CARTER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 32, pages 634 - 643 | - DONG ET AL., NAT. MED., (2002), vol. 8, pages 787 - 789 | - DONG ET AL., J. MOL. MED., (2003), vol. 81, pages 281 - 287 | - BLANK ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2005), vol. 54, pages 307 - 314 | - KONISHI ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 5094 - 5100 | - IWAI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 12293 - 12297 | - BROWN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, pages 1257 - 1266 | - BUTTE MJ ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2007), vol. 27, pages 111 - 122 | - PATERSON AM ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2011), vol. 187, pages 1097 - 1105 | - YANG J ET AL., JLMMUNOL., (20110801), vol. 187, no. 3, pages 1113 - 9 | - KEIR, M.E. ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 26 | - DONG, H. ET AL., "B7-Hl pathway and its role in the evasion of tumor immunity", J. MOL. MED., (2003), vol. 81, no. 5, pages 281 - 287 | - DONG, H. ET AL., "Tumor-associated B7-Hl promotes T-cell apoptosis: a potential mechanism of immune evasion", NAT. MED., (2002), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 793 - 800 | - BARBER, D.L. ET AL., "Restoring function in exhausted CD8 T cells during chronic viral infection", NATURE, (2006), vol. 439, no. 7077, pages 682 - 687 | - YANG J. ET AL., J IMMUUOL., (20110801), vol. 187, no. 3, pages 1113 - 9 | - HA, S.J. ET AL., "Enhancing therapeutic vaccination by blocking PD-1-mediated inhibitory signals during chronic infection", J. EXP. MED., (2008), vol. 205, no. 3, pages 543 - 555 | - FINNEFROCK, A.C. ET AL., "PD-1 blockade in rhesus macaques: impact on chronic infection and prophylactic vaccination", J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, no. 2, pages 980 - 987 | - SONG, M.-Y. ET AL., "Enhancement of vaccine-induced primary and memory CD8+ t-cell responses by soluble PD-1", J. IMMUNOTHER., (2011), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 297 - 306 | - MURATA, AM. J. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 155, pages 453 - 460 | - BALZANO, INT. J. CANCER SUPPL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 28 - 32 | - BERGE, S.M. ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - RANADE, V.V., J. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1989), vol. 29, page 685 | - UMEZAWA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1988), vol. 153, page 1038 | - BLOEMAN, P.G. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1995), vol. 357, page 140 | - OWAIS, M. ET AL., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1995), vol. 39, page 180 | - BRISCOE ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1995), vol. 1233, page 134 | - SCHREIER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 9090 | - KEINANEN, K. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1994), vol. 346, page 123 | - KILLION, J.J. ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, page 273 | - IWAI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2002), vol. 99, pages 12293 - 12297 | - IWAI ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 17, pages 133 - 144 | - HE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 173, pages 4919 - 4928 | - ROSENBERG, S., Development of Cancer Vaccines, ASCO EDUCATIONAL BOOK SPRING, (2000), pages 60 - 62 | - LOGOTHETIS, C., DEVELOPPEMENT OF CANCER VACCINES, ASCO EDUCATIONAL BOOK SPRING, (2000), pages 300 - 302 | - KHAYAT, D., DEVELOPPEMENT OF CANCER VACCINES, ASCO EDUCATIONAL BOOK SPRING, (2000), pages 414 - 428 | - FOON, K., DEVELOPPEMENT OF CANCER VACCINES, ASCO EDUCATIONAL BOOK SPRING, (2000), pages 730 - 738 | - "Cancer Vaccines", RESTIFO, N. ET AL., Cancer: Principles and Practice of Oncology, (1997), pages 3023 - 3043 | - DRANOFF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3539 - 3543 | - ROSENBERG, S.A., IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 281 - 287 | - KIM, N ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 2011 - 2013 | - SUOT, R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1585 - 1588 | - TAMURA, Y. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, pages 117 - 120 | - NESTLE, F. ET AL., NAT. MED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 328 - 332 | - KUGLER, A. ET AL., NAT. MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 332 - 336 | - MOKYR, M. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, pages 5301 - 5304 | - KEHRL, J. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1986), vol. 163, pages 1037 - 1050 | - HOWARD, M. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1992), vol. 13, pages 198 - 200 | - HAHNE, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 1363 - 1365 | - RIDGE, J. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, pages 474 - 478 | - ITO, N. ET AL., IMMUNOBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 201, no. 5, pages 527 - 540 | - WEINBERG, A. ET AL., IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 2160 - 2169 | - MELERO, I. ET AL., NAT. MED., (1997), vol. 3, pages 682 - 685 | - HUTLOFF, A. ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 397, pages 262 - 266 | - GREENBERG, R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 546 - 551 | - BUTLER, N.S. ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 13, pages 188 - 195 | - HOLLIGER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJAK, STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - OVERWIJK, W. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 2982 - 2987 | - SCHENK ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 400, pages 173 - 177 | - RESTIFO ET AL., Cancer Vaccines, pages 3023 - 3043 | - ROSENBERG, IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 281 - 287 | - KIM ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 2011 - 2013 | - SUOT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1585 - 1588 | - TAMURA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, pages 117 - 120 | - NESTLE ET AL., NAT. MED., (1998), vol. 4, pages 328 - 332 | - KUGLER ET AL., NAT. MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 332 - 336 | - MOKYR ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, pages 5301 - 5304 | - Phys cians' Desk Reference Supplement, (2004), pages 608 - 610 | - The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page 1 | - "Special Methods in Peptide Synthesis, Part A", BARANY, G. ET AL., The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1980), vol. 2, pages 3 - 284 | - "The Fluorenylmethoxycarbonyl Amino Protecting Group", ATHERTON, E. ET AL., The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 9, pages 1 - 38 | - KING, D.S. ET AL., INT. J. PEPTIDE PROTEIN RES., (1990), vol. 36, pages 255 - 266 |