EP3150456 - METHOD FOR SENSING OBJECTS AROUND PLATFORM SCREEN DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Korea Transport Institute Bangok-dong 370, Sicheong-daero Sejong 339-007 / KR | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun 111-602 (Ujangsan Hillstate Apt. Naebalsan-dong) 348 Gangseo-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-791 / KR | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Hague, Alison Jane Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15802840.7 | 02.06.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015KR05510 | Priority number, date | KR20140067078 | 02.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140067078 | [2017/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015186948 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150456 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B61B1/02, E01F1/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
B61B1/02 (EP,KR);
E01F1/00 (KR);
G01S17/04 (EP);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/88 (EP);
G01B11/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG VON OBJEKTEN RUND UM BAHNSTEIGTÜREN | [2017/14] | English: | METHOD FOR SENSING OBJECTS AROUND PLATFORM SCREEN DOORS | [2017/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER DES OBJETS AUTOUR DE PORTES-ÉCRANS DE QUAI | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2016 | Translation filed | 30.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 30.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2438644 (KNORR BREMSE RAIL SYSTEMS [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2442054 (KNORR BREMSE RAIL SYSTEMS [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US7721653 (BURGESS LAMASS [US]) [A] 1* claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH0971240 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-13* See abstract, paragraphs [0034]-[0047] and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]KR100686462B (ROTEM CO [KR]) [Y] 13 * See abstract, claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]JP2011016421 (HIGASHI NIPPON TRANSP KK, et al) [Y] 1-3, 8-10, 12-13 * See abstract, paragraphs [0043]-[0053], [0082]-[0101] and 1-8. *; | [YA]KR101186999B (SEONGHYUN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3, 8-10, 12-13 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0032], [0052]-[0055], claims 1, 8 and figures 1-3. * [A] 4-7, 11; | [A]CN101463691B (SHENYANG EAST WEST CONTROL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0043] and figures 2-3. * |