EP3161592 - TOUCH SCREEN TESTING PLATFORM HAVING COMPONENTS FOR PROVIDING CONDUCTIVITY TO A TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINSON, David, Ross c/o T-mobile USA Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 15812804.1 | 15.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US35844 | Priority number, date | US201414314339 | 25.06.2014 Original published format: US201414314339 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015200025 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161592 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F11/22 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06F11/2221 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP);
G06F3/044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | PRÜFPLATTFORM FÜR BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM MIT KOMPONENTEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON LEITFÄHIGKEIT ZU EINE SPITZE | [2017/18] | English: | TOUCH SCREEN TESTING PLATFORM HAVING COMPONENTS FOR PROVIDING CONDUCTIVITY TO A TIP | [2017/18] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE TEST POUR ÉCRAN TACTILE DISPOSANT DE COMPOSANTS PERMETTANT D'ASSURER UNE CONDUCTIVITÉ À UNE POINTE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 19.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2012146956 (JENKINSON DAVID ROSS [US]) [I] 1,8,13 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-3, 8-10 * [Y] 2-7,9-12,14,15; | [Y]WO2013158646 (VORBECK MATERIALS [US], et al) [Y] 2-7,9-12,14,15 * page 1, line 20 - line 28 * * page 3, line 6 - line 23 ** page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 14 * | International search | [A]US2011251719 (LIEN TAM [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0040], [0043]; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101146824B (JAPAN NOVEL CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0007], [0123]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2012146956 (JENKINSON DAVID ROSS [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0017], [0030], [0035], [0069]-[0070]; claims 8, 14; and figures 2, 8. *; | [A]WO2013122586 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 11; and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2014111484 (WELCH STEVEN ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraph [0058]; and figure 16. * |