EP3224080 - ENERGY HARVESTING DEVICE FOR A TRANSPORT VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidade do Porto Praça Gomes Teixeira s/n 4° S. 463 4099-002 Porto / PT | For all designated states Addvolt S.A. Rua Alfredo Allen N 455/461 4200-135 Porto / PT | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA SILVA CARVALHO, Adriano Rua Dr. Roberto Frias s/n (Feup) P-4200-465 Porto / PT | 02 /
AZEVEDO COSTA, Bruno Filipe Rua Alfredo Allen N 455/461 P-4200-135 Porto / PT | 03 /
FERREIRA DUARTE, José Manuel Rua Dr. Roberto Frias s/n (Feup) P-4200-465 Porto / PT | 04 /
SOUSA SOARES, José Ricardo Rua Alfredo Allen N 455/461 P-4200-135 Porto / PT | 05 /
NETO DE SOUSA, Justino Miguel Rua Alfredo Allen N 455/461 P-4200-135 Porto / PT | 06 /
MARINHO PIRES, Rodrigo Manuel Rua Alfredo Allen N 455/461 P-4200-135 Porto / PT | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2018/51] |
Former [2017/40] | Patentree, Lda. Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | Application number, filing date | 15813105.2 | 25.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015IB59124 | Priority number, date | PT20140108060 | 25.11.2014 Original published format: PT 2014108060 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084017 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224080 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224080 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60L8/00 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
B60L8/003 (EP,US);
B60K17/28 (US);
B60R16/033 (US);
H02S40/38 (US);
Y02E10/56 (EP);
Y02E70/30 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEGEWINNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN TRANSPORTFAHRZEUG | [2017/40] | English: | ENERGY HARVESTING DEVICE FOR A TRANSPORT VEHICLE | [2017/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ENERGY DE RÉCOLTE POUR UN VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT | [2018/27] |
Former [2017/40] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE DESTINÉ À UN VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 25.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2015 | AL | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006250902 (BENDER DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0 19] - [0024] - [0 34] - [0040] - [0 53] - [0124] * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2007028958 (RETTI KAHRL L [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0067] - [0 86] - [0108] - [ 118] - [0124] - [ 133] ** figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2010108419 (MARI CURBELO A JORGE [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0040] * * figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US2011084648 (CAO JIAN [US], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0018] - [0 32] - [0047] * [A] 1,3-18; | [IY]US8723344 (DIERICKX JAMES [US]) [I] 1,3-18 * abstract * * figures 1-18 * * column 1, line 13 - column 25, line 60 * [Y] 2 | Examination | US2006250902 | US2007028958 | US2010108419 | US2011084648 | US8723344 |