EP3204861 - PROTECTION KEY MANAGEMENT AND PREFIXING IN VIRTUAL ADDRESS SPACE LEGACY EMULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LZLabs GmbH Richtiarkade 16 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAEGER, Jan Alpenstrasse 21 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 15820283.8 | 15.12.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015IB59646 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103651 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204861 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3204861 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/79, G06F12/14 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
G06F12/1475 (EP,US);
G06F12/145 (EP,US);
G06F12/1466 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (EP,US);
G06F21/79 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1052 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | G06F12/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHLÜSSELVERWALTUNG UND -PRÄFIXIERUNG IN LEGACY-EMULATIONSSYSTEM MIT VIRTUELLEM ADRESSRAUM | [2017/33] | English: | PROTECTION KEY MANAGEMENT AND PREFIXING IN VIRTUAL ADDRESS SPACE LEGACY EMULATION SYSTEM | [2017/33] | French: | GESTION DE CLÉ DE PROTECTION ET PRÉFIXAGE DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ÉMULATION EXISTANT D'ESPACE D'ADRESSE VIRTUEL | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 10.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP19180770.0 / EP3584708 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2015 | AL | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 19.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5577231 (SCALZI CASPER A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 19, line 1 - column 22, line 66; figures 5-9 *; | [A]US2006036830 (DINECHIN CHRISTOPHE DE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figures 11-18 ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] *; | [XI]US2015106599 (GAINEY JR CHARLES W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0193] * * paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0220] * [I] 2,5,7,10 |