|
02.03.2022 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.09.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2021 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee after re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.04.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |