EP3188428 - ULTRA LOW POWER WIDEBAND ASYNCHRONOUS BPSK DEMODULATION CIRCUIT USING FIRST ORDER SIDEBAND FILTERS ALIGNED AT ZERO DEGREE PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/27] | ULTRA LOW POWER WIDEBAND ASYNCHRONOUS BINARY PHASE SHIFT KEYING DEMODULATION CIRCUIT USING FIRST ORDER SIDEBAND FILTERS ALIGNED AT ZERO DEGREE PHASE | ||
[2018/39] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilkerson, Benjamin P. A-B01, 121 Gyeonginbuk-gil, Nam-gu Incheon 22183 / KR | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 15836598.1 | 24.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015KR08835 | Priority number, date | KR20140110741 | 25.08.2014 Original published format: KR 20140110741 | [2017/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016032191 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3188428 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/027, H04L27/233, H04L27/00, H04B1/7163 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
H04L27/2331 (EP,US);
H04L27/233 (KR);
H04B1/71637 (EP,US);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04L27/2334 (EP,US);
H04L27/2335 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | H04L27/233, H03H7/18, H03H7/30, H03H11/04, H04L27/00, H03K3/3565, H03K3/023, H04B1/7163, H04L7/033, H04W4/00, H04W84/18 | ||
Former IPC [2017/27] | H04L27/233 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR ASYNCHRONEN DEMODULATION VON BPSK MIT EXTREM NIEDRIGER LEISTUNGSAUFNAHME UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SEITENBANDFILTERN ERSTER ORDNUNG, DIE AN EINER NULL-GRAD-PHASE AUSGERICHTET SIND | [2018/39] | English: | ULTRA LOW POWER WIDEBAND ASYNCHRONOUS BPSK DEMODULATION CIRCUIT USING FIRST ORDER SIDEBAND FILTERS ALIGNED AT ZERO DEGREE PHASE | [2018/39] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉMODULATION BPSK ASYNCHRONE À LARGE BANDE À ULTRA-FAIBLE PUISSANCE EMPLOYANT DES FILTRES À BANDE LATÉRALE DE PREMIER ORDRE ALIGNÉS À UNE PHASE DE ZÉRO DEGRÉS | [2018/39] |
Former [2017/27] | SCHALTUNG ZUR ASYNCHRONEN DEMODULATION VON BINÄRPHASENUMTASTUNGSMODULATION MIT EXTREM NIEDRIGER LEISTUNGSAUFNAHME UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SEITENBANDFILTERN ERSTER ORDNUNG, DIE AN EINER NULL-GRAD-PHASE AUSGERICHTET SIND | ||
Former [2017/27] | ULTRA LOW POWER WIDEBAND ASYNCHRONOUS BINARY PHASE SHIFT KEYING DEMODULATION CIRCUIT USING FIRST ORDER SIDEBAND FILTERS ALIGNED AT ZERO DEGREE PHASE | ||
Former [2017/27] | CIRCUIT DE DÉMODULATION DE MODULATION PAR DÉPLACEMENT DE PHASE BIVALENTE ASYNCHRONE À LARGE BANDE À ULTRA-FAIBLE PUISSANCE EMPLOYANT DES FILTRES À BANDE LATÉRALE DE PREMIER ORDRE ALIGNÉS À UNE PHASE DE ZÉRO DEGRÉ | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2017 | Translation filed | 24.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 24.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20130086494 (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]KR101414289B (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1,3 * | [X] - BENJAMIN P WILKERSON ET AL, "A non-coherent BPSK receiver with dual band filtering for implantable biomedical devices", ELECTRONICS, CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ICECS), 2012 19TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121209), doi:10.1109/ICECS.2012.6463630, ISBN 978-1-4673-1261-5, pages 697 - 700, XP032331620 [X] 1-5 * Sect.s I, II * * figures 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICECS.2012.6463630 | International search | [A]KR101414288B (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1,3-5 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0025], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20130086494 (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1,3-5 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0017] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101414289B (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1,3-5 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0031], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101414342B (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1,3-5 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0030] and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2931454B (UNIDEN CORP.) [A] 1,3-5 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0007] and figure 1. * |