EP3188705 - PHOTO-CHEMICALLY ACTIVATED MICRO-BUBBLE BASED ROOT CANAL DISINFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SyACT International, LLC 11202 N.W. 9th Street Plantation, FL 33325-1523 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Syact Llp 11202 N.W. 9th Street Plantation, Florida 33325 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHEN, Anil 2952 Harvey Crescent Mississuaga, Ontario L5L 4V7 / CA | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2024/32] |
Former [2017/28] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15838860.3 | 27.08.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US47245 | Priority number, date | US201414477682 | 04.09.2014 Original published format: US201414477682 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016036579 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188705 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3188705 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06, A61N5/067, A61M37/00, A61C5/50, A61K6/20, A61K6/52, A61K6/62, A61P1/02, A61P31/02 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61C5/50 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/062 (EP,KR,US);
A61K6/52 (EP,US);
A61K41/0057 (KR);
A61K6/20 (EP,US);
A61K6/62 (EP,US);
A61M37/0092 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/0603 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/0624 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/067 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61N2005/0606 (EP,KR,US);
A61N2005/0644 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0651 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0654 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | A61K6/00, A61N5/06, A61N5/067, A61M37/00, A61C5/50 | ||
Former IPC [2017/28] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOCHEMISCH AKTIVIERTE AUF MIKROBLASEN BASIERENDE WURZELKANALDESINFEKTION | [2024/13] | English: | PHOTO-CHEMICALLY ACTIVATED MICRO-BUBBLE BASED ROOT CANAL DISINFECTION | [2017/28] | French: | DÉSINFECTION DE CANAL RADICULAIRE À BASE DE MICROBULLES PHOTOCHIMIQUEMENT ACTIVÉES | [2017/28] |
Former [2017/28] | FOTOCHEMISCH AKTIVIERTE AUF MIKROBLASEN BASIERENDE WURZELKANALDESINFEKTION | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 04.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7306459 (WILLIAMS JILL ANN [GB], et al); | [Y]US2008255498 (HOULE PHILIP R [US]); | [X]US2009285766 (KISHEN ANIL [SG], et al); | [Y]US2010092922 (RUDDLE CLIFFORD J [US]); | [XY]US2011027384 (KISHEN ANIL [SG], et al); | [IY]US2012270177 (NAKASHIMA MISAKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2013084545 (NETCHITAILO VLADIMIR [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2006019220 (LOEBEL NICOLAS G [US], et al); | [XY]US2011027384 (KISHEN ANIL [SG], et al); | [Y]US2014220505 (KHAKPOUR MEHRZAD [US], et al) | by applicant | US7261561 | US2008255498 | US2009287566 | US2009285766 | US2011027384 | US8235719 | US2012270177 | US8328552 | US8388345 |